Global Patent Index - EP 1259319 A1

EP 1259319 A1 2002-11-27 - HYDROCARBON HYDROGENATION CATALYST AND PROCESS

Title (en)

HYDROCARBON HYDROGENATION CATALYST AND PROCESS

Title (de)

KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HYDRIERUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

CATALYSEUR D'HYDROGENATION D'HYDROCARBURE ET PROCESSUS

Publication

EP 1259319 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00992242 A

Priority

  • US 0042068 W
  • US 45984699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0141923A1] A catalyst composition which can be used for hydrogenating a highly unsaturated hydrocarbon such as an alkyne or a diolefin to a less unsaturated hydrocarbon is disclosed. The catalyst composition contains palladium, an inorganic support, and a catalyst component of silver and an alkali metal compound. The catalyst composition can additionally contain a halide, preferably a halide of a non-alkali metal halide. A process of making such catalyst composition is also disclosed. The process of using such catalyst composition involves contacting a hydrocarbon-containing fluid, which contains a highly unsaturated hydrocarbon, with a catalyst composition in the presence of hydrogen under a hydrogenation condition sufficient to effect a hydrogenation of the highly unsaturated hydrocarbon. The process of using such catalyst composition can be conducted in the presence or absence of a sulfur impurity such as a sulfur compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 23/58; B01J 23/66; C07C 7/167; C07C 5/05; C07C 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/58 (2006.01); B01J 23/66 (2006.01); C07C 5/03 (2006.01); C07C 5/08 (2006.01); B01J 23/44 (2006.01); B01J 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 5/03 (2013.01); B01J 23/58 (2013.01); B01J 23/66 (2013.01); C07C 5/08 (2013.01); B01J 23/44 (2013.01); B01J 27/12 (2013.01); B01J 35/1009 (2013.01); C07C 2521/04 (2013.01); C07C 2521/06 (2013.01); C07C 2521/08 (2013.01); C07C 2521/12 (2013.01); C07C 2523/06 (2013.01); C07C 2523/44 (2013.01); C07C 2523/50 (2013.01); C07C 2527/08 (2013.01); C07C 2527/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0141923 A1 20010614; AU 3969301 A 20010618; BR 0016337 A 20020827; CA 2392259 A1 20010614; CN 1413127 A 20030423; EP 1259319 A1 20021127; EP 1259319 A4 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060113

2004-12-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041015

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERGMEISTER, JOSEPH, J.

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHEUNG, TIN-TACK, PETER

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DELZER, GARY, A.

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZISMAN, STAN, A.

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BROWN, SCOTT, H.

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOHNSON, MARVIN, M.

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BYERS, JIM, D.

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TIEDTKE, DARIN, B.

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOUNG, DAVID, A.

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERGMEISTER, JOSEPH, J.

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHEUNG, TIN-TACK, PETER

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DELZER, GARY, A.

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZISMAN, STAN, A.

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BROWN, SCOTT, H.

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOHNSON, MARVIN, M.

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BYERS, JIM, D.

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TIEDTKE, DARIN, B.

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020708

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI