Global Patent Index - EP 1259326 A2

EP 1259326 A2 2002-11-27 - TOP FOR A PAPER SHREDDER, FOR RECEIVING AND FEEDING IN PAPER

Title (en)

TOP FOR A PAPER SHREDDER, FOR RECEIVING AND FEEDING IN PAPER

Title (de)

AUFSATZ FÜR AKTENVERNICHTER ZUR AUFNAHME UND ZUFÜHRUNG VON SCHRIFTGUT

Title (fr)

COUVERCLE D'UNE DECHIQUETEUSE DE DOCUMENTS DESTINE A RECEVOIR ET GUIDER DES DOCUMENTS

Publication

EP 1259326 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01927702 A

Priority

  • DE 10008742 A
  • EP 0102123 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162390A2] The invention relates to a top for a paper shredder, for receiving and feeding in paper, especially crumpled paper such as is found in waste paper baskets and similar; and to a method for filling a paper shredder using said top. The paper shredder has a housing consisting of a cabinet-type lower part and an optionally removable upper part, together with a cutting mechanism situated in the upper part of the housing and comprising cutting rollers and strippers, and an associated drive assembly. A feed shaft for so-called crumpled paper is provided above the cutting mechanism and the top can be permanently or optionally detachably mounted above said feed shaft. Together with a covered, worked-out top area of the upper housing part, the top forms a receiving compartment for crumpled paper. This receiving compartment is connected to the feed shaft. The invention also provides in particular that the top (11) has an integrated closing unit (20) comprising moveable parts which can change location and with which the filling opening (17) of the top (11) and the intermediate area between the receiving compartment and the feed shaft (10) can be alternately opened and closed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/24 (2006.01); B02C 18/00 (2006.01); B02C 18/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/0007 (2013.01); B02C 18/2291 (2013.01); B02C 2018/0046 (2013.01); B02C 2018/168 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162390A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162390 A2 20010830; WO 0162390 A3 20020221; WO 0162390 A8 20020321; AT 299048 T 20050715; AU 5466901 A 20010903; DE 10008742 A1 20010913; DE 10008742 C2 20030821; EP 1259326 A2 20021127; EP 1259326 B1 20050706; ES 2245359 T3 20060101; JP 2001239496 A 20010904; US 2002014547 A1 20020207; US 6595444 B2 20030722

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160224

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160224

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150225

2016-03-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106689

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2016-03-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106689

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160329

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106689

- Representative's name: KANZLEI "REGION GOEPPINGEN" (GBR) PATENTANWALT, DE

2015-05-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106689

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2015-05-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106689

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2015-02-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140206

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHWELLING, HERMANN

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060224

2006-02-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2245359 T3

2005-12-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-10-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-10-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-10-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-10-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-08-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106689 P 20050811

2005-08-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-07-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-07-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-07-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-07-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-07-06 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020914

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI