Global Patent Index - EP 1259336 A1

EP 1259336 A1 2002-11-27 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCTION OF EMBEDDED OR INHERENT TORSIONAL STRAIN IN REINFORCING STEEL OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCTION OF EMBEDDED OR INHERENT TORSIONAL STRAIN IN REINFORCING STEEL OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REDUZIEREN VON INTERNEN SPANNUNGEN IN ARMIERUNGSEISEN ODER ÄHNLICHEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A REDUIRE UNE DEFORMATION DE TORSION INHERENTE OU INCORPOREE DANS DE L'ACIER POUR ARMATURE OU EQUIVALENT

Publication

EP 1259336 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01901139 A

Priority

  • DK 0100044 W
  • DK PA200000180 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160540A1] A method and an apparatus for reducing embedded or inherent torsional strains in reinforcement steel (2) by guiding the reinforcement steel (2) between at least one set of two rows with straightening means. There are at least two straightening means in the first row and three in the second row and the means have grooves for receiving and guiding the reinforcement steel (2). One of the straightening means is displaced and locked in position for the formation of a curved path for the reinforcement steel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 3/02; B21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/05 (2006.01); B21F 1/02 (2006.01); B21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 9/00 (2013.01); B21D 3/05 (2013.01); B21F 1/02 (2013.01); B21F 9/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160540A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160540 A1 20010823; AT 320868 T 20060415; AU 2665901 A 20010827; DE 60118154 D1 20060511; DE 60118154 T2 20061221; DK 1259336 T3 20060731; EP 1259336 A1 20021127; EP 1259336 B1 20060322

INPADOC legal status


2013-03-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: EVG ENTWICKLUNGS- U. VERWERTUNGS- GESELLSCHAFT M.B

- Effective date: 20061219

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-05 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-05-05 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070120

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2008-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060623

2007-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EVG ENTWICKLUNGS- U. VERWERTUNGS- GESELLSCHAFT M.B

- Effective date: 20061219

2007-01-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070122

2006-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-08-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060822

2006-07-31 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2006-07-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-06-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60118154 P 20060511

2006-04-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-03-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040618

2003-01-02 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PEDERSEN, HANS

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NIELSEN, HENRIK, DAN

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JESPERSEN, CHRISTIAN

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHRISTENSEN, JAN, DALL

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI