Global Patent Index - EP 1259349 A2

EP 1259349 A2 2002-11-27 - THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITE MATERIAL

Title (en)

THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITE MATERIAL

Title (de)

THERMOPLASTISCHES VERBUNDMATERIAL

Title (fr)

MATERIAU COMPOSITE THERMOPLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1259349 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00929457 A

Priority

  • DE 19921209 A
  • EP 0003852 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19921209A1] The invention relates to a thermoplastic composite material containing an organic fiber material and a mixture of two or more organic fiber materials and a thermoplastic bonding agent. The invention further relates to a method for producing said thermoplastic composite material and to the use of said thermoplastic material in the surface coating of objects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 27/12 (2006.01); C08J 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/047 (2013.01); B32B 27/12 (2013.01); C08J 5/045 (2013.01); C08J 5/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0067937A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20023654 U1 20050609; AU 4752900 A 20001121; BR 0010357 A 20020213; DE 19921209 A1 20001116; EP 1259349 A2 20021127; WO 0067937 A2 20001116; WO 0067937 A3 20020912

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091103

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040419

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040419

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEDERTECH GMBH

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011027

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT