Global Patent Index - EP 1259357 A1

EP 1259357 A1 2002-11-27 - MACHINE TOOL

Title (en)

MACHINE TOOL

Title (de)

WERKZEUGMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE-OUTIL

Publication

EP 1259357 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01909706 A

Priority

  • DE 10007665 A
  • EP 0100956 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160570A1] The invention relates to a gearbox (10, 12), which may be switched using an operating element (14, 16), by means of at least one clutch element (18). Said gearbox comprises at least one spring element (20, 22) arranged in the force path, between the operating element (14, 16) and the clutch element (18), fixed to a first component (24, 26) in at least two switching directions (28, 30) and in the opposite sense of the force path, fixed to a second component (32, 34) in at least the two switching directions (28, 30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 16/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/00 (2006.01); B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 16/006 (2013.01); Y10T 74/1946 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20177 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20183 (2013.01); Y10T 408/65 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160570A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160570 A1 20010823; CN 100406207 C 20080730; CN 1404431 A 20030319; DE 10007665 A1 20010906; EP 1259357 A1 20021127; EP 1259357 B1 20030903; JP 2003523835 A 20030812; JP 4933713 B2 20120516; US 2003079562 A1 20030501; US 6942435 B2 20050913

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030903

2004-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-10-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100576 P 20031009

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI TR

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI