Global Patent Index - EP 1259362 A1

EP 1259362 A1 2002-11-27 - DISK CHIPPER AND METHOD FOR FASTENING A BEDKNIFE TO A DISK CHIPPER

Title (en)

DISK CHIPPER AND METHOD FOR FASTENING A BEDKNIFE TO A DISK CHIPPER

Title (de)

SCHEIBENZERSPANER UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES UNTERMESSERS AUF AUF EINEM SCHEIBENZERSPANER

Title (fr)

DECHIQUETEUSE A DISQUE ET PROCEDE DE FIXATION D'UN COUTEAU FIXE SUR UNE DECHIQUETEUSE A DISQUE

Publication

EP 1259362 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01903844 A

Priority

  • FI 0100097 W
  • US 49834000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6148882A] A disk chipper includes a bedknife, the bedknife having opposing first and second surfaces, and a chipper frame, the chipper frame having an opening for receiving the bedknife, the opening being defined by opposing first and second surfaces for facing the first and second surfaces of the bedknife, respectively. The disk chipper further includes a wedge, the wedge being movable in a first direction between the second surface of the bedknife and the second surface of the chipper frame to move the first surface of the bedknife in a second direction substantially perpendicular to the first direction toward the first surface of the chipper frame. A method for fastening a bedknife to a disk chipper is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/005 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49863 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49948 (2013.01); Y10T 403/76 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0156757A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6148882 A 20001121; CA 2398240 A1 20010809; EP 1259362 A1 20021127; EP 1259362 B1 20031119; ES 2206398 T3 20040516; WO 0156757 A1 20010809

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060203

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-02-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060203

2006-02-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060203

2006-02-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060202

2005-02-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050218

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-02-10 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-02-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-02-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2206398 T3

2004-03-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FI FR SE

2003-09-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER PORI OY

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FI FR SE