Global Patent Index - EP 1259366 A1

EP 1259366 A1 2002-11-27 - COMPOSITE MATERIAL

Title (en)

COMPOSITE MATERIAL

Title (de)

KOMPOSITMATERIAL

Title (fr)

MATERIAU COMPOSITE

Publication

EP 1259366 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01907454 A

Priority

  • DE 10009280 A
  • EP 0100456 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10009280A1] Material comprises a microfilament fleece of 50-200g/m<2> based on melt spun, stretched multi-component, continuous filaments with a weight/unit length of 1.5-5dtex. After >= 80% solidification the continuous filaments are split and simultaneously solidified to form micro continuous filaments with a weight/unit length of 0.1-1.2dtex. A thermoplastic material is then injection molded onto the fleece. An Independent claim is also included for a process for manufacturing the composite material in the fleece from continuous filaments, partially solidified and then subjected to high pressure fluid jets which complete the solidification and simultaneously split the filaments into micro filaments before backing with thermoplastic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 45/14; B29C 70/22; D04H 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/14 (2006.01); B29C 70/22 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 70/22 (2013.01); B29C 45/14786 (2013.01); B32B 27/02 (2013.01); B32B 27/12 (2013.01); B32B 27/32 (2013.01); B32B 27/34 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01); B29K 2105/0818 (2013.01); B29K 2105/0854 (2013.01); B29L 2031/3005 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2904 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0164416A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10009280 A1 20010906; DE 10009280 B4 20060518; AR 027425 A1 20030326; AU 3542401 A 20010912; CA 2401440 A1 20010907; EP 1259366 A1 20021127; US 2003148096 A1 20030807; WO 0164416 A1 20010907

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060801

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040220

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GROTEN, ROBERT

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHUSTER, MATTHIAS

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RIBOULET, GEORGES

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;MK