Global Patent Index - EP 1259371 A2

EP 1259371 A2 2002-11-27 - V-BELT DRIVE FOR DIVERTING A VERTICAL FORCE OF PRESSURE

Title (en)

V-BELT DRIVE FOR DIVERTING A VERTICAL FORCE OF PRESSURE

Title (de)

KEILTRIEB ZUR UMLENKUNG EINER VERTIKALEN PRESSKRAFT

Title (fr)

ENTRAINEMENT PAR COURROIE EN V POUR DEVIER UNE FORCE DE COMPRESSION VERTICALE

Publication

EP 1259371 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99966939 A

Priority

  • DE 19860178 A
  • EP 9909723 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19860178C1] The wedge drive for diverting a vertical pressing force includes a slider (2) guided in slide faces (8) which are arranged in prism formation. The return of the slider is produced by a gas compression spring (5) mounted in the slider. An assembly plate (4) is mounted on the slider. A casting shoulder for compensating the forces acting on the driver (1) is mounted on the slider guide at the side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/32 (2006.01); B30B 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0038907A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860178 C1 20000511; EP 1259371 A2 20021127; EP 1259371 B1 20051012; ES 2247861 T3 20060301; WO 0038907 A2 20000706; WO 0038907 A3 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091211

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110304

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091210

2011-03-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110307

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091210

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091210

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090305 AND 20090311

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2247861 T3

2006-02-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-02-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WEIGELT, HARALD

2006-02-01 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: WEIGELT, HARALD

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2005-10-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-05-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010613

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE