Global Patent Index - EP 1259386 A1

EP 1259386 A1 2002-11-27 - MACHINE FOR PROCESSING DOCUMENTS SUCH AS MAIL WITH ADJUSTABLE SINGULATOR

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR PROCESSING DOCUMENTS SUCH AS MAIL WITH ADJUSTABLE SINGULATOR

Title (de)

POSTMASCHINE MIT VERSTELLBARER TRENNUNG

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT DE DOCUMENTS TELS QUE DU COURRIER A SEPARATEUR REGLABLE

Publication

EP 1259386 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01907626 A

Priority

  • FR 0100161 W
  • FR 0002180 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162521A1] The invention concerns a machine for processing documents such as mail comprising means for laterally driving the first document (1) of a stack towards a narrow passage located between a roller (9) and an adjustable singulator (11) through power-operated driving means (13), acting in response to a control signal for moving in one direction or another or for stopping, means generating a signal for moving in the direction closing the passage when the cycle starts, a detector (8) sensing the presence of documents upstream of the passage generating a signal opening the passage, and a detector (14) sensing the presence of a document downstream of the passage generating a signal stopping displacement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43M 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43M 3/04 (2006.01); B43M 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/04 (2013.01); B43M 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162521A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162521 A1 20010830; CA 2390704 A1 20010830; DE 60100850 D1 20031030; DE 60100850 T2 20040715; EP 1259386 A1 20021127; EP 1259386 B1 20030924; FR 2805212 A1 20010824; FR 2805212 B1 20021115

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60100850

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110301

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SECAP

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030924

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-12-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60100850 P 20031030

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI SE

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI