Global Patent Index - EP 1259402 A1

EP 1259402 A1 2002-11-27 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INTERPRETING EVENTS AND OUTPUTTING OPERATING INSTRUCTIONS IN MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INTERPRETING EVENTS AND OUTPUTTING OPERATING INSTRUCTIONS IN MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EREIGNISINTERPRETATION UND AUSGABE VON BEDIENHINWEISEN IN KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'INTERPRETATION D'EVENEMENTS ET D'AFFICHAGE D'INSTRUCTIONS DANS DES VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 1259402 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01925286 A

Priority

  • DE 0100612 W
  • DE 10007218 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160661A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for interpreting events and outputting operating instructions in motor vehicles. The invention is based on the concept of combining the sum of fault information resulting from the sum of sensors and the complex technologies of modern vehicles, optionally linking this to experience obtained by empirical means and outputting operating instructions to the driver. These operating instructions should be technically comprehensible to the driver and adapted to the situation in which he/she momentarily finds him/herself. The inventive concept is based on the use of an electronic data base (24) containing the technical information, including the error code for devices belonging to the sensory and electronics systems (18) of the vehicle, for evaluating event information informing the driver clearly and concisely about problems that occur. The data base can also be the object of a query initiated directly by the driver.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 16/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 16/02 (2006.01); B60R 16/023 (2006.01); G08B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 16/0232 (2013.01); B60R 16/0234 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160661A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160661 A1 20010823; CN 1230327 C 20051207; CN 1423603 A 20030611; DE 10007218 A1 20010906; DE 10007218 B4 20091126; EP 1259402 A1 20021127; JP 2003522673 A 20030729; US 2003144775 A1 20030731; US 6859695 B2 20050222

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20090131

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050321

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KLAUSNER, MARKUS

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR