Global Patent Index - EP 1259421 A2

EP 1259421 A2 2002-11-27 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INCREASING FLOATING PLATFORM BUOYANCY

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INCREASING FLOATING PLATFORM BUOYANCY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM VERGRÖSSERN DES AUFTRIEBS EINER SCHWIMMENDENPLATTFORM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA FLOTTABILITE D'UNE PLATEFORME FLOTTANTE

Publication

EP 1259421 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01914513 A

Priority

  • US 0106160 W
  • US 18402200 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162583A2] The hull (12) of a floating platform has at least one deck (14) for supporting drilling and/or production equipment above the surface of a body of water (16). A base node of the hull includes pontoons (18) extending radially outwardly of the hull. The platform being secured to a sea bed by anchoring tendons (20) to the pontoons (18). A column extension (22), in the form of a closed cylinder, provides a buoyancy module (32) to the lower end of the hull (12). A mounting post (24) may be pre-installed about the periphery of the hull (12) in order to attach the buoyancy module (32) to the hull (12). Riser hangers (33), for attaching at least one riser or flow line (34) to the column extension/buoyancy module (22)/(32).

[origin: WO0162583A2] A floating platform for recovery of oil and gas from offshore oil and gas fields includes a hull having a portion located substantially below the water surface, and including a portion thereof which extends above the water surface. The platform is anchored to the seabed by one or more tendons secured to the base of the hull and the seabed. The playload capacity of the floating platform is increased without redesigning the structural design of the hull by attaching a column extension or mounting a detachable buoyancy module to the lower end of the hull for accomodating changing platform payload requirements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 35/44; E02B 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/50 (2006.01); B63B 35/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/502 (2013.01); B63B 35/4413 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FI FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162583 A2 20010830; WO 0162583 A3 20020117; AU 2001239891 B2 20060302; AU 3989101 A 20010903; BR 0108589 A 20031223; BR 0108589 B1 20101116; CA 2400903 A1 20010830; CA 2400903 C 20081230; EP 1259421 A2 20021127; EP 1259421 A4 20030409; EP 1259421 B1 20060503; ES 2264439 T3 20070101; MX PA02008141 A 20030128; NO 20023980 A 20021021; NO 20023980 D0 20020821; NO 332002 B1 20120521

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130223

2014-05-12 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140512

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130222

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130222

2013-09-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130901

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120629

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100222

2009-05-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2007-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2264439 T3

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FI FR GB NL

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): ES FI FR GB NL

2004-02-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-04-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030221

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 63B 35/44 A

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 63B 9/06 B

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI