Global Patent Index - EP 1259423 A1

EP 1259423 A1 2002-11-27 - TWO-ENGINE PROPULSION SYSTEM FOR A SHIP

Title (en)

TWO-ENGINE PROPULSION SYSTEM FOR A SHIP

Title (de)

ZWEIMOTOREN-SCHIFFSANTRIEBSANLAGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PROPULSION DE NAVIRE A DEUX MOTEURS

Publication

EP 1259423 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01902364 A

Priority

  • DE 10005050 A
  • EP 0100965 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0156877A1] The invention relates to a two-engine propulsion system for a ship, comprising a front and a rear propelling engine (M1,M2), whereby the propulsion power thereof can be coupled to an output shaft (7) of said ship by means of a gear system (6). The shafts of the gear mechanism are disposed on top of each other in an essentially vertical manner. The output shaft (7) of the ship extends below the rear propelling engine (M2). According to the invention, an input gear (14) is arranged on a rear input shaft (10) and continuously meshes with an intermediate gear (Z2) which is arranged on a first axis of rotation (1). An output gear (13) which is arranged on a gear output shaft (11) also continuously meshes with an intermediate gear (Z1) which is arranged on the first axis of rotation (1), whereby a large vertical axial distance arises between the rear input shaft (10) and the gear output shaft (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 23/02; B63H 23/10; B63H 23/12; B63H 23/20; B63H 23/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/10 (2006.01); B63H 23/02 (2006.01); B63H 23/12 (2006.01); B63H 23/20 (2006.01); B63H 23/28 (2006.01); F16H 3/083 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/12 (2013.01); B63H 23/02 (2013.01); B63H 23/20 (2013.01); B63H 23/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0156877A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0156877 A1 20010809; AU 3021401 A 20010814; DE 10005050 A1 20010809; EP 1259423 A1 20021127; EP 1259423 B1 20040811; JP 2003523868 A 20030812; NO 20023265 A 20020801; NO 20023265 D0 20020705; US 2003003817 A1 20030102; US 6688924 B2 20040210

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50103219

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-14 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20081126

2008-09-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RENK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20050510

2007-06-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RENK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-08-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-07-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RENK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040811

2005-01-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-11-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103219 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARSLAND, GEORGE

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROTHENHAEUSLER, GUENTER

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BARETH, WINFRIED

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BENNATI, FRANCO

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI