Global Patent Index - EP 1259430 A2

EP 1259430 A2 2002-11-27 - CONTAINER HAVING REINFORCING MEANS

Title (en)

CONTAINER HAVING REINFORCING MEANS

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER MIT VERSTÄRKUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT RENFOR ABLE DE MANIERE SELECTIVE

Publication

EP 1259430 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01903033 A

Priority

  • US 0100902 W
  • US 17562600 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151363A2] The container has a plurality of upstanding sidewalls (20) interconnected by a floor pan (22). The sidewalls are selectively reinforceable with upstanding struts (42). The struts are removable from the sidewall and transformable between reinforcing and nonreinforcing positions preferably without separation from the container. The floor pan of the container may also be reinforced. If so, the floor pan support and sidewalls struts may be made of a contiguous articulable, planar reinforcement (40). The sidewall struts may be articulated about proximal ends (44) juxtaposed with the floor pan. The sidewall struts are particularly useful for collapsible containers.

[origin: WO0151363A2] A container. The container has a plurality of upstanding sidewalls interconnected by a floor pan. The sidewalls are selectively reinforceable with upstanding struts. The struts are removable from the sidewall and transformable between reinforcing and nonreinforcing positions preferably without separation from the container. The floor pan of the container may also be reinforced. If so, the floor pan support and sidewalls struts may be made of a contiguous articulable, planar reinforcement. The sidewall struts may be articulated about proximal ends juxtaposed with the floor pan. The sidewall struts are particularly useful for collapsible containers

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/40 (2006.01); B65D 6/28 (2006.01); B65D 8/18 (2006.01); B65D 25/20 (2006.01); B65D 77/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/0433 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0151363A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151363 A2 20010719; WO 0151363 A3 20011220; AU 3090401 A 20010724; BR 0107587 A 20020924; CA 2395067 A1 20010719; CA 2395067 C 20090414; CN 1394184 A 20030129; DE 60105558 D1 20041021; DE 60105558 T2 20051006; EP 1259430 A2 20021127; EP 1259430 B1 20040915; ES 2225473 T3 20050316; JP 2003519600 A 20030624; MX PA02006476 A 20021129; US 2002000445 A1 20020103

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130112

2014-03-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140321

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130111

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130111

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60105558

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130111

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101215

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-05-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225473 T3

2005-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60105558 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI