Global Patent Index - EP 1259452 A2

EP 1259452 A2 2002-11-27 - VACUUM EAR-FOLDING PROCESS AND APPARATUS

Title (en)

VACUUM EAR-FOLDING PROCESS AND APPARATUS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM OHRENFALTEN DURCH UNTERDRUCK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PLIAGE A DEPRESSION

Publication

EP 1259452 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01912772 A

Priority

  • US 0104978 W
  • US 50692000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160731A2] A process and apparatus (20) for folding a moving web (26) includes a blade member (38) which can operatively engage and fold the web (26), and a guide member (40) joined to the blade member (38). A holder mechanism (56) is operatively connected with the guide member (40) to control a portion (28) of the web (26) during the folding of the moving web. In particular aspects, the holder mechanism can include a vacuum device (57, 87) which tensions an appointed folded portion (28, 30) of the web.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/08 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); B65H 45/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/15747 (2013.01); B65H 45/22 (2013.01); B65H 2406/30 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1924 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0160731A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160731 A2 20010823; WO 0160731 A3 20020516; AU 4151801 A 20010827; EP 1259452 A2 20021127; JP 2004502616 A 20040129; MX PA02007336 A 20021209; NO 20023909 A 20020816; NO 20023909 D0 20020816

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-07-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030828

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI