Global Patent Index - EP 1259490 A2

EP 1259490 A2 2002-11-27 - SYNTHESIS OF EPOTHILONES, INTERMEDIATES THERETO AND ANALOGUES THEREOF

Title (en)

SYNTHESIS OF EPOTHILONES, INTERMEDIATES THERETO AND ANALOGUES THEREOF

Title (de)

DARSTELLUNG VON EPOTHILONEN, DAZU ANALOGEN VERBINDUNGEN UND ZWISCHENPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

SYNTHESE D'EPOTHILONES, DE LEURS PRODUITS INTERMEDIAIRES ET DE LEURS ANALOGUES

Publication

EP 1259490 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01916335 A

Priority

  • US 0106643 W
  • US 18596800 P
  • US 25044700 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0164650A2] The present invention provides convergent processes for preparing epothilones, desoxyepothilones, and analogues thereof. The present invention further provides novel compositions and methods for the treatment of cancer and additionally provides methods for the treatment of cancer which has developed a multi-drug phenotype.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 225/02; A61P 35/00; C07D 315/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 277/24 (2006.01); A61K 31/337 (2006.01); A61K 31/427 (2006.01); A61K 31/475 (2006.01); A61K 31/704 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 41/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 45/64 (2006.01); C07C 49/24 (2006.01); C07C 68/00 (2006.01); C07C 69/96 (2006.01); C07C 327/28 (2006.01); C07D 417/06 (2006.01); C07D 417/14 (2006.01); C07D 491/044 (2006.01); C07D 493/04 (2006.01); C07F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 417/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0164650A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0164650 A2 20010907; WO 0164650 A3 20020510; AU 4337201 A 20010912; CA 2401800 A1 20010907; EP 1259490 A2 20021127; JP 2004500388 A 20040108

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140314

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040813

2003-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DANISHEFSKY, SAMUEL, J.

2003-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEE, CHUL, BOM

2003-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHAPPELL, MARK

2003-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STACHEL, SHAWN

2003-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHOU, TING-CHAO

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI