Global Patent Index - EP 1259493 A2

EP 1259493 A2 2002-11-27 - Substituted piperazine compounds

Title (en)

Substituted piperazine compounds

Title (de)

Substituierte Piperazin-Verbindungen

Title (fr)

Composés de pipérazine substitués

Publication

EP 1259493 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01911085 A

Priority

  • US 0105606 W
  • US 18418200 P
  • US 18445700 P
  • US 18430600 P
  • US 20639600 P
  • US 20926200 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162744A2] Novel compounds of the general formula (I) and pharmaceutically acceptable acid addition salts thereof, wherein the compounds are useful in therapy to protect skeletal muscles against damage resulting from trauma or to protect skeletal muscles subsequent to muscle or systemic diseases such as intermittent claudication, to treat shock conditions, to preserve donor tissue and organs used in transplants, in the treatment of cardiovascular diseases including atrial and ventricular arrhythmias, Prinzmetal's (variant) angina, stable angina, and exercise induced angina, congestive heart disease, and myocardial infarction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 241/04; A61K 31/495; A61K 31/498; A61K 31/4995; A61P 9/00; C07D 241/08; C07D 241/42; C07D 295/108; C07D 317/54; C07D 317/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/14 (2006.01); A01N 1/02 (2006.01); A61K 9/08 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 31/407 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/498 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 21/00 (2006.01); A61P 39/06 (2006.01); C07D 241/04 (2006.01); C07D 241/08 (2006.01); C07D 241/36 (2006.01); C07D 241/42 (2006.01); C07D 295/15 (2006.01); C07D 317/54 (2006.01); C07D 317/58 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01); C07D 487/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/15 (2013.01); C07D 241/04 (2013.01); C07D 241/08 (2013.01); C07D 241/42 (2013.01); C07D 317/54 (2013.01); C07D 317/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162744A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162744 A2 20010830; WO 0162744 A3 20020207; AR 029229 A1 20030618; AU 2001238623 B2 20040923; AU 3862301 A 20010903; BR 0108592 A 20040629; CA 2400176 A1 20010830; CA 2400176 C 20090428; CA 2657986 A1 20010830; CN 1404471 A 20030319; EP 1259493 A2 20021127; IL 151178 D0 20030410; JP 2003531116 A 20031021; JP 2007211009 A 20070823; JP 3980885 B2 20070926; MX PA02008213 A 20040405; NO 20023954 A 20020930; NO 20023954 D0 20020820; NO 324837 B1 20071217; NZ 520782 A 20040326; TW I236471 B 20050721

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-10-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1052175

2011-03-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SUBSTITUTED PIPERAZINE COMPOUNDS

2011-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZABLOCKI, JEFF

2011-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ELZEIN, ELFATIH

2011-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NUDELMAN, GRIGORY

2011-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARQUART, TIM

2011-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VARKHEDKAR, VAIBHAV

2011-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IBRAHIM, PRABHA, N.

2011-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PALLE, VENKATA, P.

2011-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLACKBURN, BRENT, K.

2009-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZABLOCKI, JEFF

2009-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ELZEIN, ELFATIH

2009-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NUDELMAN, GRIGORY

2009-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARQUART, TIM

2009-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VARKHEDKAR, VAIBHAV

2009-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IBRAHIM, PRABHA, N.

2009-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PALLE, VENKATA, P.

2009-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLACKBURN, BRENT, K.

2007-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZABLOCKI, JEFF

2007-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ELZEIN, ELFATIH

2007-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NUDELMAN, GRIGORY

2007-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARQUART, TIM

2007-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VARKHEDKAR, VAIBHAV

2007-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IBRAHIM, PRABHA, N.

2007-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PALLE, VENKATA, P.

2007-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLACKBURN, BRENT, K.

2006-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040709

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZABLOCKI, JEFF

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ELZEIN, ELFATIH

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NUDELMAN, GRIGORY

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARQUART, TIM

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VARKHEDKAR, VAIBHAV

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IBRAHIM, PRABHA, N.

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PALLE, VENKATA, P.

2006-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLACKBURN, BRENT, K.

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040709

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZABLOCKI, JEFF

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ELZEIN, ELFATIH

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NUDELMAN, GRIGORY

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARQUART, TIM

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VARKHEDKAR, VAIBHAV

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IBRAHIM, PRABHA, N.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PALLE, VENKATA, P.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLACKBURN, BRENT, K.

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZABLOCKI, JEFF

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ELZEIN, ELFATIH

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NUDELMAN, GRIGORY

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARQUART, TIM

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VARKHEDKAR, VAIBHAV

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IBRAHIM, PRABHA, N.

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PALLE, VENKATA, P.

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLACKBURN, BRENT, K.

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI