Global Patent Index - EP 1259527 A1

EP 1259527 A1 2002-11-27 - 35 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

35 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

35 MENSCHLICH SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

35 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1259527 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00978417 A

Priority

  • US 0030653 W
  • US 16473599 P
  • US 22119300 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0134628A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating diseases, disorders, and/or conditions related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/08 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0134628 A1 20010517; AU 1588301 A 20010606; CA 2389326 A1 20010517; EP 1259527 A1 20021127; EP 1259527 A4 20041027; JP 2004512811 A 20040430

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RUBEN, STEVEN, M.

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOMATSOULIS, GEORGE, A.

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIRSE, CHARLES, E.

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NI, JIAN

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOORE, PAUL, A.

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050308

2004-10-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 A

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI