Global Patent Index - EP 1259585 A1

EP 1259585 A1 2002-11-27 - CLEAR RINSING AGENTS

Title (en)

CLEAR RINSING AGENTS

Title (de)

KLARSPÜLMITTEL

Title (fr)

AGENTS DE RINCAGE

Publication

EP 1259585 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01902341 A

Priority

  • DE 10003809 A
  • EP 0100612 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10003809A1] The invention relates to clear rinsing agents, for machine dish washing, which comprise hydroxy mixed ethers and alkyl or alkenyl oligoglycosides, optionally, further non-ionic surfactants, water and further auxiliaries and additives. The invention further relates to the use of said mixtures in clear rinsing agents and a method for rinsing and cleaning hard surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/825

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/825 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/721 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0155288A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10003809 A1 20010802; EP 1259585 A1 20021127; EP 1259585 B1 20040804; ES 2225470 T3 20050316; US 2003139306 A1 20030724; US 6732748 B2 20040511; WO 0155288 A1 20010802; WO 0155288 A9 20020919

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170120

2018-05-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180507

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170119

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170929

2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160119

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160119

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50103102

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2009-01-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-07-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2005-06-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225470 T3

2004-12-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103102 P 20040909

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KAHRE, JOERG

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ELSNER, MICHAEL

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMID, KARL, HEINZ

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOESTER, RITA

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR