Global Patent Index - EP 1259591 A2

EP 1259591 A2 2002-11-27 - POLYPETPTIDES AND METHODS FOR THYMIC VACCINATION

Title (en)

POLYPETPTIDES AND METHODS FOR THYMIC VACCINATION

Title (de)

POLYPEPTIDE UND METHODE ZUR THYMUS IMPFUNG

Title (fr)

POLYPEPTIDES ET METHODES DE VACCINATION THYMIQUE

Publication

EP 1259591 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00983712 A

Priority

  • US 0031502 W
  • US 16737899 P
  • US 16816799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0138394A2] Methods of thymic vaccination are described, in which a polypeptide of interest is administered and which allows positive or negative selection of a T cell receptor (TCR) specificity in the thymus, to retain a desired specificity (positive) or to eliminate an undesired specificity (negative) at the level of TCR repertoire development, in order to generate TCRs which are designed to recognize disease antigens or foreign antigens, such as to treat or prevent cancers, autoimmune diseases, infections, or effects of biological warfare agents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/06; C07K 14/145; C07K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/145 (2006.01); C07K 14/725 (2006.01); A61K 35/12 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 7/06 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/0008 (2013.01); C07K 14/005 (2013.01); A61K 2035/122 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5158 (2013.01); A61K 2039/57 (2013.01); C12N 2760/20222 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0138394 A2 20010531; WO 0138394 A3 20020502; CA 2392387 A1 20010531; EP 1259591 A2 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-26 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1047766

2006-08-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060218

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REINHERZ, ELLIS, L.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SASADA, TETSURO

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WANG, JIA-HUAI

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR