Global Patent Index - EP 1259612 A2

EP 1259612 A2 2002-11-27 - G-PROTEIN COUPLED RECEPTOR RELATED POLYPEPTIDES

Title (en)

G-PROTEIN COUPLED RECEPTOR RELATED POLYPEPTIDES

Title (de)

G-PROTEIN GEKOPPELTE REZEPTOR VERWANDTE POLYPEPTIDE

Title (fr)

NOUVELLES PROTEINES ET ACIDES NUCLEIQUES CODANT POUR CES PROTEINES

Publication

EP 1259612 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01916415 A

Priority

  • US 0107116 W
  • US 18660600 P
  • US 18724700 P
  • US 18724800 P
  • US 18724900 P
  • US 18725000 P
  • US 18725300 P
  • US 18729500 P
  • US 18729600 P
  • US 18756300 P
  • US 21985400 P
  • US 22026300 P
  • US 22194200 P
  • US 25760000 P
  • US 26028501 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0166746A2] Disclosed herein are nucleic acid sequences that encode G-coupled protein-receptor related polypeptides. Also disclosed are polypeptides encoded by these nucleic acid sequences, and antibodies, which immunospecifically-bind to the polypeptide, as well as derivatives, variants, mutants, or fragments or the aforementioned polypeptide, polynucleotide, or antibody. The invention further discloses therapeutic, diagnostic and research methods for diagnosis, treatment, and prevention of disorders involving any one of these novel human nucleic acids and proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 31/70; A61K 38/17; A61K 39/395; C07K 14/705; C07K 16/28; C12N 1/21; C12N 5/10; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); C07K 2317/21 (2013.01); C07K 2317/622 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0166746A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0166746 A2 20010913; WO 0166746 A3 20020530; AU 4344401 A 20010917; CA 2401549 A1 20010913; EP 1259612 A2 20021127; JP 2003525633 A 20030902

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PADIGARU, MURALIDHARA

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURGESS, CATHERINE, E.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAJUMDER, KUMUD

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MISHRA, VISHNU, S.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LI, LI

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUMGARTNER, JASON, C.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SPYTEK, KIMBERLY, A.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TCHERNEV, VELIZAR, T.

2005-02-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PADIGARU, MURALIDHARA

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURGESS, CATHERINE, E.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAJUMDER, KUMUD

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MISHRA, VISHNU, S.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LI, LI

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUMGARTNER, JASON, C.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SPYTEK, KIMBERLY, A.

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TCHERNEV, VELIZAR, T.

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PADIGARU, MURALIDHARA

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURGESS, CATHERINE, E.

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAJUMDER, KUMUD

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MISHRA, VISHNU, S.

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LI, LI

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUMGARTNER, JASON, C.

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SPYTEK, KIMBERLY, A.

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TCHERNEV, VELIZAR, T.

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PADIGARU, MURALIDHARA

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURGESS, CATHERINE, E.

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAJUMDER, KUMUD

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MISHRA, VISHNU, S.

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LI, LI

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUMGARTNER, JASON, C.

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SPYTEK, KIMBERLY, A.

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TCHERNEV, VELIZAR, T.

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PADIGARU, MURALIDHARA

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURGESS, CATHERINE, E.

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAJUMDER, KUMUD

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MISHRA, VISHNU, S.

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LI, LI

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUMGARTNER, JASON, C.

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SPYTEK, KIMBERLY, A.

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TCHERNEV, VELIZAR, T.

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI