Global Patent Index - EP 1259630 A1

EP 1259630 A1 2002-11-27 - FERMENTATION WITH A PHYTASE

Title (en)

FERMENTATION WITH A PHYTASE

Title (de)

FERMENTATION UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER PHYTASE

Title (fr)

FERMENTATION A L'AIDE DE LA PHYTASE

Publication

EP 1259630 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01907391 A

Priority

  • DK 0100125 W
  • DK PA200000281 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162947A1] The present invention relates to an improved fermentation process wherein phytic acid-containing material is fermented in the presence of a phytase, e.g. in fermentation for the production of ethanol.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12P 7/06; C12C 11/00; C12G 1/022; C12G 3/02; C12N 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12C 11/00 (2006.01); C12G 3/02 (2006.01); C12N 9/16 (2006.01); C12P 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12C 5/004 (2013.01); C12G 3/02 (2013.01); C12N 9/16 (2013.01); C12P 7/06 (2013.01); Y02E 50/17 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162947A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162947 A1 20010830; AU 3536001 A 20010903; EP 1259630 A1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050412

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VEIT, CHRIS

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FELBY, CLAUS

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PECKOUS, LARRY, W.

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OLSEN, HANS, SEJR

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VEIT, CHRIS

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FELBY, CLAUS

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PECKOUS, LARRY, W.

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OLSEN, HANS, SEJR

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI