Global Patent Index - EP 1259652 A4

EP 1259652 A4 2003-06-25 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR RECOVERY OF CYANIDE AND METALS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR RECOVERY OF CYANIDE AND METALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERGEWINNUNG VON CYANID UND METALLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE RECUPERATION DE CYANURE ET DE METAUX

Publication

EP 1259652 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01907238 A

Priority

  • AU 0100177 W
  • AU PQ576800 A
  • AU PQ911700 A
  • AU PR321201 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162993A1] Disclosed is a process for recovery of cyanide and metals from a liquor containing complexes of cyanide and metal typically generated by a metallurgical or industrial process. The process involves electrochemical dissociation of the metal-cyanide complex and electrowinning of the metal while free cyanide generated in the process is recovered in a membrane treatment step for re-use in a metallurgical process utilising it. An electrochemical apparatus, which may be used in the process, forms a further aspect of the invention. A membrane process alone, for separation of cyanide, from liquors containing cyanide complexes is a further aspect of the invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 11/08; C22B 15/00; C25C 1/12; C25C 1/20; C25C 7/00; C25C 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/461 (2006.01); C22B 3/44 (2006.01); C22B 11/08 (2006.01); C22B 15/00 (2006.01); C22B 19/20 (2006.01); C22B 23/00 (2006.01); C25B 9/00 (2006.01); C25C 1/00 (2006.01); C25C 1/12 (2006.01); C25C 1/20 (2006.01); C25C 5/02 (2006.01); C25C 7/00 (2006.01); C25C 7/04 (2006.01); C25C 7/06 (2006.01); C02F 1/00 (2006.01); C02F 1/44 (2006.01); C02F 1/467 (2006.01); C02F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/46104 (2013.01); C22B 11/046 (2013.01); C22B 11/08 (2013.01); C25C 5/02 (2013.01); C25C 7/00 (2013.01); C02F 1/44 (2013.01); C02F 1/46109 (2013.01); C02F 1/467 (2013.01); C02F 1/4678 (2013.01); C02F 9/00 (2013.01); C02F 2101/18 (2013.01); C02F 2101/20 (2013.01); C02F 2201/4611 (2013.01); C02F 2201/46185 (2013.01); C02F 2301/024 (2013.01); Y02P 10/214 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 0162993A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162993 A1 20010830; BR 0108594 A 20050201; CA 2400806 A1 20010830; EP 1259652 A1 20021127; EP 1259652 A4 20030625; JP 2003524071 A 20030812; US 2003089619 A1 20030515

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-02-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR RECOVERY OF CYANIDE AND METALS

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAKEFIELD ORETEST PTY LTD

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OCCTECH ENGINEERING PTY LTD.

2003-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030509

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI