Global Patent Index - EP 1259653 A1

EP 1259653 A1 2002-11-27 - ZIRCONIUM NIOBIUM-TIN-IRON ALLOY FOR USE IN NUCLEAR REACTORS AND METHOD OF ITS MANUFACTURE

Title (en)

ZIRCONIUM NIOBIUM-TIN-IRON ALLOY FOR USE IN NUCLEAR REACTORS AND METHOD OF ITS MANUFACTURE

Title (de)

ZIRKON-NIOB-ZINN-EISEN-LEGIERUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN KERNREAKTOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

ALLIAGES ZIRCONIUM-NIOBIUM-ETAIN MODIFIES DESTINES A L'UTILISATION DANS DES REACTEURS NUCLEAIRES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1259653 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01906602 A

Priority

  • US 0101845 W
  • US 50691300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0161062A1] A corrosion resistant zirconium based alloy for use in nuclear fuel cladding is made of a low tin content zirconium alloy consisting essentially of: by weight percent, 0.60-2.0 Nb; when Sn is 0.25, then Fe is 0.50; when Sn is 0.40, then Fe is 0.35 to 0.50; when Sn is 0.50, then Fe is 0.25 to 0.50; when Sn is 0.70, then Fe is 0.05 to 0.50; when Sn is 1.0, then Fe is 0.05 to 0.50 (area 10 of FIG. 1); where the weight percent of Fe plus Sn is greater than 0.75, with no more than 0.50 additional other component elements and with the remainder Zr.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 16/00; C22F 1/18; G21C 3/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21C 5/00 (2006.01); C22C 16/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/18 (2006.01); G21C 3/07 (2006.01); G21C 3/30 (2006.01); G21D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 16/00 (2013.01); C22F 1/186 (2013.01); G21C 3/07 (2013.01); Y02E 30/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0161062A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0161062 A1 20010823; AU 3449201 A 20010827; CN 1152146 C 20040602; CN 1404532 A 20030319; EP 1259653 A1 20021127; JP 2001262260 A 20010926; RU 2002124765 A 20040320; SE 0202478 D0 20020819; SE 0202478 L 20020819; SE 526648 C2 20051018

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT FR

2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-10-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030403

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI