Global Patent Index - EP 1259664 A2

EP 1259664 A2 2002-11-27 - CONTROLLED NECK GROWTH PROCESS FOR SINGLE CRYSTAL SILICON

Title (en)

CONTROLLED NECK GROWTH PROCESS FOR SINGLE CRYSTAL SILICON

Title (de)

KONTROLLIERTES VERFAHREN ZUR ZÜCHTUNG EINES HALSES EINES SILIZIUMEINKRISTALLES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CROISSANCE DE RETRECISSEMENT REGULE POUR SILICIUM MONOCRISTALLIN

Publication

EP 1259664 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01914414 A

Priority

  • JP 2000044369 A
  • JP 2000136811 A
  • US 0105379 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0163022A2] A process for preparing a single crystal silicon in accordance with the Czochralski method, is provided. More specifically, by quickly redueing the pull rate at least once during the growth of a neck portion of the single crystal silicon ingot, in order to change the melt/solid interface shape from a concave to a convex shape, the present process enables zero dislocation growth to be achieved in a large diameter neck within a comparably short neck length, such that large diameter ingots of substantial weight can be produced safely and at a high throughput.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C30B 15/00; C30B 15/22; C30B 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C30B 29/06 (2006.01); C30B 15/00 (2006.01); C30B 15/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C30B 29/06 (2013.01); C30B 15/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163022A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0163022 A2 20010830; WO 0163022 A3 20020725; EP 1259664 A2 20021127; JP 2001316198 A 20011113; JP 4521933 B2 20100811; KR 20020081343 A 20021026; TW 500841 B 20020901

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-03-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI