Global Patent Index - EP 1259665 A2

EP 1259665 A2 2002-11-27 - CARBONIZATION OF CELLULOSIC FIBROUS MATERIALS IN THE PRESENCE OF AN ORGANOSILICON COMPOUND

Title (en)

CARBONIZATION OF CELLULOSIC FIBROUS MATERIALS IN THE PRESENCE OF AN ORGANOSILICON COMPOUND

Title (de)

KARBONISIERUNG VON CELLULOSEFASERMATERIALIEN IN GEGENWART EINER ORGANOSILICIUMVERBINDUNG

Title (fr)

CARBONISATION DE MATERIAUX FIBREUX CELLULOSIQUES EN PRESENCE D'UN COMPOSE ORGANOSILICIE

Publication

EP 1259665 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00985407 A

Priority

  • FR 0003389 W
  • FR 9915329 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142544A2] The invention relates to a method for obtaining fibrous carbon materials by continuous or non-continuous carbonization of cellulosic fibrous materials in the presence of at least one organosilicon compound. The invention is characterized in that said organosilicon compound is chosen from the group comprising oligomers and resins which are cross-linked, cyclic or branched, which have a numerical average molecular mass of between 500 and 10 000 and which are made up of radicals of formula SiO4 (referred to as Q4 radicals) and radicals of formula SiOxRy(OR')z.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 9/16; D01F 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/643 (2006.01); D01F 9/16 (2006.01); D01F 11/14 (2006.01); D03D 15/12 (2006.01); D06M 101/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 9/16 (2013.01); D01F 11/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142544A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142544 A2 20010614; WO 0142544 A3 20011227; AT 265560 T 20040515; AU 2183401 A 20010618; BR 0016124 A 20021119; BR 0016124 B1 20120110; DE 60010343 D1 20040603; DE 60010343 T2 20050504; EP 1259665 A2 20021127; EP 1259665 B1 20040428; FR 2801907 A1 20010608; FR 2801907 B1 20020301; JP 2003516478 A 20030513; JP 4651256 B2 20110316; MX PA02005624 A 20040910; RU 2002115274 A 20040110; RU 2256013 C2 20050710; UA 72780 C2 20020916; US 2002182139 A1 20021205; US 7226639 B2 20070605

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161207

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Document: AT 265560 T

- Effective date: 20140311

2013-06-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Effective date: 20130513

2013-03-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130221 AND 20130227

2013-03-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SNECMA PROPULSION SOLIDE S.A., LE HAILLAN CEDEX, FR

- Document: DE 60010343

- Effective date: 20130114

2013-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60010343

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130114

2013-01-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60010343

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010343 P 20040603

2004-06-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI