Global Patent Index - EP 1259667 A1

EP 1259667 A1 2002-11-27 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A WEAVING DEVICE AND WEAVING DEVICE FOR PERFORMING SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A WEAVING DEVICE AND WEAVING DEVICE FOR PERFORMING SAID METHOD

Title (de)

KONTROLLVERFAHREN FÜR EINE WEBVORRICHTUNG UND WEBVORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TISSAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE TISSAGE PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1259667 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01910230 A

Priority

  • NL 0100111 W
  • NL 1014537 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0164986A1] Method and device for controlling a loom, comprising a weaving machine including a shed, through which a yarn is conveyed by means of at least one main weft yarn injector, to which a pressurized medium is supplied, wherein at least the time of arrival of the yarn at the end of the shed is detected, wherein the ideal time of arrival of the yarn end at the end of the shed is determined on the basis of the number of revolutions of the loom, and, upon commencement of the weaving process, the ideal medium pulse that is transmitted to the yarn via the main injector during the initial phase of the weft insertion is determined in such a manner that the yarn end will reach the end of the shed at a specified ideal velocity at the aforesaid ideal point in time, wherein detection of the ideal arrival times associated with a number of positions in the shed takes place at said positions, from which an ideal position-time diagram for the yarn being conveyed through the shed is derived, after which the time of arrival of the yarn end is detected at the aforesaid several positions with each weft insertion during the weaving process, which time is then compared with the ideal arrival times associated with said positions as determined before, after which, if a difference between the measured times and the ideal times is detected, the medium pulse transmitted to the yarn in the main injector is adapted so that the measured differences are entirely or partially eliminated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 51/12; D03D 47/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/28 (2006.01); D03D 47/30 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01); D03D 51/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/3053 (2013.01); D03D 47/3033 (2013.01); D03D 51/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0164986A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0164986 A1 20010907; AU 3780801 A 20010912; CN 1261631 C 20060628; CN 1406294 A 20030326; DE 60107210 D1 20041223; DE 60107210 T2 20051201; EP 1259667 A1 20021127; EP 1259667 B1 20041117; JP 2003525360 A 20030826; NL 1014537 C2 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070209

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TE STRAKE TEXTILE B.V.

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-02-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-01-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060106

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60107210 P 20041223

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2004-07-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI

2003-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TE STRAKE TEXTILE B.V.

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI