Global Patent Index - EP 1259669 A1

EP 1259669 A1 2002-11-27 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE THREAD LEVER OF A BRAIDER AND A BRAIDER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE THREAD LEVER OF A BRAIDER AND A BRAIDER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES FADENHEBELS EINER FLECHTMASCHINE UND FLECHTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR COMMANDER LE LEVIER PORTE-FIL D'UN METIER A TRESSER, ET METIER A TRESSER

Publication

EP 1259669 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00903645 A

Priority

EP 0000615 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0155493A1] The present invention relates to a braider (1) comprising a device for controlling the thread lever (10). Said braider is formed by a curved path (30) that is closed in a circular ring-shaped manner, a sliding block (31) appurtenant thereto and a reverse gear (20) by means of which the direction of rotation of the drive motor is reversed in such a way that the group of the upper delivery bobbins and the group of the lower delivery bobbins rotate in opposing directions. The aim of the invention is to enable such a braider (1) to have a higher ceiling speed. The sliding block (31) and the curved path (30) are situated within the surface (32) of rotation, whereby said surface is circumscribed by the course of the thread lever (10) around a central axis (50) in relation to the braider (1), and/or the reverse gear (20) is provided with an internal ring gear which is fixed to the central pipe (3) and has a great reference diameter, a pinion circulating therein and an outer ring gear that is rotatably mounted on the central pipe (3) and has a small reference diameter. The pinion is rotatably mounted on a circulating axle which is rigidly connected to the housing. Said pinion causes the positive fit between the internal ring gear and the outer ring gear.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04C 3/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04C 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04C 3/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0155493A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0155493 A1 20010802; AT 277212 T 20041015; EP 1259669 A1 20021127; EP 1259669 B1 20040922; ES 2225083 T3 20050316; JP 2003527496 A 20030916; US 6694855 B1 20040224

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160127

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160127

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160127

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160127

2016-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 277212 T

- Effective date: 20160127

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150115

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK NIEHOFF GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Document: AT 277212 T

- Effective date: 20121121

2012-07-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120621 AND 20120627

2012-06-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK NIEHOFF GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20120523

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110128

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225083 T3

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050105

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020621

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE