Global Patent Index - EP 1259677 A1

EP 1259677 A1 2002-11-27 - INTERCONNECTION OF TWO WOOD BEAMS THAT ARE JOINED TOGETHER WHILE FORMING AN AT LEAST APPROXIMATELY RIGHT ANGLE

Title (en)

INTERCONNECTION OF TWO WOOD BEAMS THAT ARE JOINED TOGETHER WHILE FORMING AN AT LEAST APPROXIMATELY RIGHT ANGLE

Title (de)

VERBINDUNG VON ZWEI ZUMINDEST ANNÄHERND RECHTWINKLIG ANEINANDER ANSCHLIESSENDEN HOLZBALKEN

Title (fr)

ASSEMBLAGE DE DEUX POUTRES EN BOIS SE RACCORDANT MUTUELLEMENT AU MOINS APPROXIMATIVEMENT A ANGLE DROIT

Publication

EP 1259677 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01911661 A

Priority

  • DE 20003705 U
  • EP 0101861 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2401435A1] In order to effect an interconnection of two wood beams (1, 2) that are join ed together while forming an at least approximately right angle, screws (3) are provided which engage inside both wood beams (1, 2). To this end, at least t wo screws (3) are inserted which are arranged in two planes running parallel to one another and which are screwed in such that they cross. In one of the bea ms (2), screws (3) are inserted in planes that are parallel to the grain and th us engage in the other beam (1) at a right angle or acute angle to the grain.</ SDOAB>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/26 (2006.01); F16B 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/2604 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2652 (2013.01); Y10T 403/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165018A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20003705 U1 20010712; AT 317472 T 20060215; AU 4063501 A 20010912; CA 2401435 A1 20010907; CZ 20022451 A3 20030115; DE 50108903 D1 20060420; DK 1259677 T3 20060522; EP 1259677 A1 20021127; EP 1259677 B1 20060208; ES 2258075 T3 20060816; NO 20024098 A 20020828; NO 20024098 D0 20020828; SK 9642002 A3 20030204; US 2003021625 A1 20030130; WO 0165018 A1 20010907

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060208

2008-11-25 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2008-11-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20080219

2008-09-17 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080219

2008-09-17 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20080219

2008-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060220

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060208

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080204

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060509

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080107

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070220

2007-10-15 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2007-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WIELAND, HEINZ, DIPL. BAUING.

2007-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HECO-SCHARUBEN GMBH & CO. KG

2007-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ABC VERBINDUNGSTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

2007-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BIERBACH GMBH & CO KG BEFESTIGUNGSTECHNIK

2007-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WIELAND, HEINZ, DIPL. BAUING.

2006-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WIELAND, HEINZ, DIPL. BAUING.

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HECO-SCHARUBEN GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ABC VERBINDUNGSTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20061107

2006-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BIERBACH GMBH & CO KG BEFESTIGUNGSTECHNIK

- Effective date: 20061107

2006-11-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WIELAND, HEINZ, DIPL. BAUING.

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2258075 T3

2006-07-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060710

2006-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-05-02 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060502

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-04-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108903 P 20060420

2006-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JUERG PLUESS SFS INTEC AG INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MA

2006-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-02-15 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-02-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI