Global Patent Index - EP 1259700 A1

EP 1259700 A1 2002-11-27 - TRACER INJECTION IN A PRODUCTION WELL

Title (en)

TRACER INJECTION IN A PRODUCTION WELL

Title (de)

MARKIERUNGSEINSPRITZUNG IN EINEM PRODUKTIONSBOHRLOCH

Title (fr)

INJECTION DE TRACEUR DANS UN PUITS DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1259700 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01916357 A

Priority

  • US 0106800 W
  • US 18650400 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0165053A1] A petroleum well (20) comprises a well casing (30), a production tubing (40), a source of time-varying current (68), a downhole tracer injection device (60), and a downhole induction choke (90). The casing (30) extends within a wellbore of the well (20). The tubing (40) extends within the casing (30). The current source (68) is located at the surface. The current source (68) is electrically connected to, and adapted to output a time-varying current into, the tubing (40) and/or the casing (30), which act as electrical conductors for providing downhole power and/or communications to the injection device (60). The injection device (60) comprises a communications and control module (80), a tracer material reservoir (82), and an electrically controllable tracer injector (84). The communications and control module (80) is electrically connected to the tubing (40) and/or the casing (30). The downhole induction choke (90) is located about a portion of the tubing (40) and/or the casing (30). The induction choke (90) is adapted to route part of the electrical current through the communications and control module (80) by creating a voltage potential between one side of the induction choke (90) and another side of the induction choke (90). The communications and control module (80) is electrically connected across the voltage potential. The well (20) can further comprise a sensor (108) or a sensor device (140) located upstream of the injection device (60) and being adapted to detect the tracer material injected into the well by the injection device. The sensor device (140) may also be downhole, and may comprise a modem (146) to send data to the surface via the tubing (40) and/or casing (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/00; E21B 34/06; E21B 47/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/11 (2012.01); E21B 17/00 (2006.01); E21B 34/06 (2006.01); E21B 34/08 (2006.01); E21B 34/16 (2006.01); E21B 43/00 (2006.01); E21B 43/12 (2006.01); E21B 43/14 (2006.01); E21B 47/10 (2012.01); E21B 47/12 (2012.01); H04B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/122 (2013.01); E21B 17/003 (2013.01); E21B 34/066 (2013.01); E21B 34/08 (2013.01); E21B 34/16 (2013.01); E21B 43/123 (2013.01); E21B 43/14 (2013.01); E21B 47/1015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165053A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0165053 A1 20010907; AU 2001243391 B2 20041007; AU 4339101 A 20010912; BR 0108888 A 20040622; BR 0108888 B1 20090505; CA 2402163 A1 20010907; CA 2402163 C 20091020; DE 60128446 D1 20070628; DE 60128446 T2 20080117; EP 1259700 A1 20021127; EP 1259700 B1 20070516; MX PA02008508 A 20030128; NO 20024137 A 20021029; NO 20024137 D0 20020830; NO 326367 B1 20081117; OA 13129 A 20061213; RU 2002126211 A 20040220; RU 2263783 C2 20051110

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160302

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160302

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60128446

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-10-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120306

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080219

2007-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60128446 P 20070628

2007-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2007-05-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-11-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB LI NL

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI