Global Patent Index - EP 1259709 A1

EP 1259709 A1 2002-11-27 - CONTROLLABLE PRODUCTION WELL PACKER

Title (en)

CONTROLLABLE PRODUCTION WELL PACKER

Title (de)

STEUERBARER PRODUKTIONSBOHRLOCHPACKER

Title (fr)

GARNITURE D'ETANCHEITE DE PUITS DE PRODUCTION POUVANT ETRE COMMANDEE

Publication

EP 1259709 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01918345 A

Priority

  • US 0106984 W
  • US 18637500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0165067A1] An apparatus and method for operating an electrically powered device (42) in a packer (40) using the piping structure (24) of the well (38) as an electrical conductor for providing power and/or communications. The electrically powered device (42) may comprise an electrically controllable valve (44), a communications and control module, a modem, a sensor, and/or a tracer injection module.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 47/12; E21B 33/129

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/12 (2006.01); E21B 33/129 (2006.01); E21B 43/12 (2006.01); E21B 47/12 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/122 (2013.01); E21B 33/1294 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165067A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0165067 A1 20010907; AU 2001245433 B2 20040819; AU 4543301 A 20010912; BR 0108887 A 20040629; CA 2401730 A1 20010907; CA 2401730 C 20090804; DE 60125020 D1 20070118; DE 60125020 T2 20070405; EP 1259709 A1 20021127; EP 1259709 B1 20061206; MX PA02008582 A 20030414; NO 20024145 A 20021029; NO 20024145 D0 20020830; NO 324145 B1 20070903; OA 12321 A 20060512; RU 2002126210 A 20040220; RU 2262597 C2 20051020

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140302

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140302

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070907

2007-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60125020 P 20070118

2006-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2006-12-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB LI NL

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI