Global Patent Index - EP 1259729 A2

EP 1259729 A2 2002-11-27 - ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE FOR CONTROLLING AN INJECTION VALVE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE FOR CONTROLLING AN INJECTION VALVE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

MAGNETVENTIL ZUR STEUERUNG EINES EINSPRITZVENTILS EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

ELECTROVANNE DESTINEE A LA COMMANDE D'UNE SOUPAPE D'INJECTION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1259729 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01994586 A

Priority

  • DE 0104318 W
  • DE 10058007 A
  • DE 10113008 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0242632A2] The invention relates to an electromagnetic valve for controlling an injection valve of an internal combustion engine, comprising an electromagnet (29), a moving armature with an armature plate (28) and an armature pin (27); and a control valve member (25) which is moved with the armature and which interacts with a valve seat (24), for opening and closing a fuel drainage channel (17) of a control pressure chamber (14) of the injection valve (1). The armature plate (28) is mounted in such a way that under the influence of its inert mass, the armature plate can slide on the armature pin in the closing direction of the control valve member (25), in the opposite direction to the clamping force of a return spring (35) which acts on the armature plate. The inventive electromagnetic valve also comprises a hydraulic damping device with which the post-oscillation of the armature plate (28) after its dynamic displacement on the armature pin (27) can be damped. In order to simplify the assembly and reduce a disadvantageous post-oscillation process of the armature plate, the invention provides that the return spring (35) is supported on a support part (50) which is situated on the armature pin (27) and which is moved with said armature pin, by the end (62) of the return spring facing away from the armature plate (28). Said support part (50) also forms part (57) of the damping device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0036 (2013.01); F02M 2200/304 (2013.01); F02M 2200/306 (2013.01); F02M 2547/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0242632A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0242632 A2 20020530; WO 0242632 A3 20020808; DE 50108770 D1 20060406; EP 1259729 A2 20021127; EP 1259729 B1 20060118; ES 2256333 T3 20060716; JP 2004514823 A 20040520; JP 4138481 B2 20080827; US 2004026540 A1 20040212; US 6796543 B2 20040928

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180731

2018-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108770

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111117

2013-06-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130603

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2256333 T3

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108770 P 20060406

2006-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2006-01-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060118

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030208

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR