Global Patent Index - EP 1259734 A1

EP 1259734 A1 2002-11-27 - COMPACT ELECTROHYDRAULIC MOTOR PUMP UNIT

Title (en)

COMPACT ELECTROHYDRAULIC MOTOR PUMP UNIT

Title (de)

KOMPAKTES ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHES MOTORPUMPENAGGREGAT

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE MOTOPOMPE ELECTROHYDRAULIQUE COMPACT

Publication

EP 1259734 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01902386 A

Priority

  • DE 10009587 A
  • EP 0101111 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10009587A1] The invention relates to a compact electrohydraulic motor pump unit comprising a housing (10) which forms a reservoir for a pressurised fluid. Said housing contains an electromotor (11) and has a first housing sealing section (12), a second housing sealing section (13) and a tubular housing mid-section (14) positioned therebetween. A support plate (35) for a pump (40) that can be driven by the electromotor (11) using a motor shaft (23) and that can be supplied by the pressurised fluid along a pressurised flow route to a delivery valve (88), is located between the second housing sealing section (13) and the electromotor (11). In order to reduce the number of sealing points between the interior and the exterior of the housing, the invention is characterised in that the delivery valve (88) is situated on the exterior of the second housing sealing section (13), that the second housing sealing section (13) and the tubular housing mid-section (14) lie adjacent to one another at their peripheries, sealing the interior of the housing (10) towards the exterior and that the support plate (35) is completely contained within the interior of the housing (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 17/03; F04B 23/02; F04B 53/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 17/03 (2006.01); F04B 23/02 (2006.01); F04B 53/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 23/021 (2013.01); F04B 17/03 (2013.01); F04B 53/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165115A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10009587 A1 20010830; DE 50109286 D1 20060511; EP 1259734 A1 20021127; EP 1259734 B1 20060322; US 2003077188 A1 20030424; US 6746218 B2 20040608; WO 0165115 A1 20010907

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170202

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-12-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171031

2017-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170202

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109286 P 20060511

2006-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060413

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2005-10-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH AG

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR