Global Patent Index - EP 1259735 A2

EP 1259735 A2 2002-11-27 - RECIPROCATING PISTON MACHINE

Title (en)

RECIPROCATING PISTON MACHINE

Title (de)

HUBKOLBENMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A PISTONS ALTERNATIFS

Publication

EP 1259735 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01915075 A

Priority

  • DE 0100819 W
  • DE 20013202 U
  • DE 20022264 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0165070A2] The invention relates to a reciprocating piston machine, in particular to a compressor, preferably for the air conditioning system of a motor vehicle, comprising a housing (1) and a housing cover (3). The working unit (2) which encompasses the pistons (7) is located in the housing (1) and the intake and outlet zone (4, 5) is configured in the housing cover (3), said housing cover (3) being screwed on to the housing (1). The invention is characterised in that to simplify the construction whilst maintaining sufficient impermeability, the screw connection is designed as an individual thread which forms the contact between the housing (1) and the housing cover (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/10; F04B 39/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/08 (2006.01); F04B 39/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/0891 (2013.01); F04B 39/121 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165070A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0165070 A2 20010907; WO 0165070 A3 20020328; AU 4228901 A 20010912; DE 10190756 D2 20030612; EP 1259735 A2 20021127; EP 1259735 B1 20090114

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150305

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150305

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114657

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140410

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAGNA POWERTRAIN BAD HOMBURG GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: IXETIC BAD HOMBURG GMBH, 61352 BAD HOMBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50114657

- Effective date: 20140910

2014-10-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50114657

- Representative's name: RAUSCH, GABRIELE, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

- Effective date: 20140910

2014-09-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50114657

- Representative's name: RAUSCH, GABRIELE, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140320

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-12-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091015

2009-03-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114657 P 20090305

2009-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-09-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IXETIC MAC GMBH

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060314

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OBRIST, FRANK

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUHN, PETER

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEIPEL, VOLKER

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI