Global Patent Index - EP 1259762 A1

EP 1259762 A1 2002-11-27 - WATER LANCE BLOWER WITH MONITORING DEVICE FOR THE QUALITY OF THE WATER JET, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME

Title (en)

WATER LANCE BLOWER WITH MONITORING DEVICE FOR THE QUALITY OF THE WATER JET, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME

Title (de)

WASSERLANZENBLÄSER MIT ÜBERWACHUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR DIE QUALITÄT DES WASSERSTRAHLS UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB

Title (fr)

SOUFFLERIE DE LANCE A EAU AVEC DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE POUR LA QUALITE DU JET D'EAU ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE L'ACTIONNER

Publication

EP 1259762 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01909805 A

Priority

  • DE 10009831 A
  • EP 0102288 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10009831A1] Device has water lance (1) with nozzle (13) for water jet and mouthpiece (2). Lance is movably arranged with its mouthpiece on or in hatch. Jet (4) can be blown onto wall regions reachable from hatch through operating heating system (21), which carries flows of flame and/or flue gases. Lance has one sensor (12), e.g. of sound in solids, for detecting at least one water jet quality monitoring parameter. Independent claims are also included for the following: a method of operating a water lance blower.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23J 3/02; F28G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 3/02 (2006.01); F28G 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 3/023 (2013.01); F28G 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165180A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 10009831 A1 20010913; AU 3742201 A 20010912; DE 50108379 D1 20060119; EP 1259762 A1 20021127; EP 1259762 B1 20051214; US 2003047196 A1 20030313; US 6715499 B2 20040406; WO 0165180 A1 20010907

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108379

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108379

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060331

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070202

2007-02-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-11-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108379 P 20060119

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-12-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARTELS, FRANZ

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRACH, MANFRED

2003-02-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EIMER, KLAUS

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI