Global Patent Index - EP 1259765 A2

EP 1259765 A2 2002-11-27 - OUTDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER

Title (en)

OUTDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER

Title (de)

AUSSENEINHEIT FÜR KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

UNITE EXTERIEURE POUR CLIMATISEUR

Publication

EP 1259765 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01906359 A

Priority

  • JP 0101471 W
  • JP 2000054600 A
  • JP 2000067067 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0165184A2] An outdoor unit for an air conditioner, comprise a unit main body (5) which is a housing having a base plate (1), a compressor (3), a heat exchanger (8) and a blower (9) which are mounted and fixed on the base plate of the unit main body, and fixing legs (11, 12) which are provided on the unit main body and to be fixed on a mount part by means of fixing elements, wherein the fixing legs are formed as one body with the base plate of the unit main body.

[origin: WO0165184A2] An outdoor unit for an air conditioner, comprise a unit main body which is a housing having a base plate, a compressor, a heat exchanger and a blower which are mounted and fixed on the base plate of the unit main body, and fixing legs which are provided on the unit main body and to be fixed on a mount part by means of fixing elements, wherein the fixing legs are formed as one body with the base plate of the unit main body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 5/00 (2006.01); F24F 1/56 (2011.01); F24F 13/20 (2006.01); F24F 13/22 (2006.01); F24F 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/60 (2013.01); F24F 1/12 (2013.01); F24F 1/46 (2013.01); F24F 13/20 (2013.01); F24F 13/22 (2013.01); F24F 13/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165184A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0165184 A2 20010907; WO 0165184 A3 20020117; AU 3419501 A 20010912; CN 1148537 C 20040505; CN 1406328 A 20030326; DE 60113238 D1 20051013; DE 60113238 T2 20060713; EP 1259765 A2 20021127; EP 1259765 B1 20050907; JP 2001317766 A 20011116; JP 3523823 B2 20040426; TW I225141 B 20041211

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60113238

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090227

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100210

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60113238 P 20051013

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI