Global Patent Index - EP 1259855 A1

EP 1259855 A1 2002-11-27 - OPTICAL DEVICE

Title (en)

OPTICAL DEVICE

Title (de)

OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE

Publication

EP 1259855 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02710182 A

Priority

  • GB 0200494 W
  • GB 0102957 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02063389A1] An optical device comprises a substrate on which is provided two input waveguides (100, 110) connected to a first optical coupler (120), two output waveguides (130, 140) connected to a second optical coupler (150), and a pair of waveguide arms (160, 170) connected between the two couplers, wherein the first optical coupler comprises two waveguide portions (122, 124), a first one of which has a greater relative width than the second, and wherein the second optical coupler comprises two waveguide portions (152, 154), the first one of which has a smaller relative width than the second, the first waveguide portion of the first coupler being connected by a first one of the waveguide arms to the first waveguide portion of the second coupler, and the second waveguide portion of the first coupler being connected by the second waveguide arm to the second waveguide portion of the second coupler.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/313

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/313 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/3132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 02063389A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 02063389 A1 20020815; EP 1259855 A1 20021127; GB 0102957 D0 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEMFIRE EUROPE LIMITED

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVANEX U.K. LIMITED

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR