Global Patent Index - EP 1259874 A1

EP 1259874 A1 2002-11-27 - INPUT UNIT ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

INPUT UNIT ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

EINGANGSEINHEITANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE UNITE D'ENTREE

Publication

EP 1259874 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01906486 A

Priority

  • SE 0100361 W
  • SE 0000541 A
  • SE 0000939 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0161454A1] An electronic device (200), such as a computer, a mobile phone or a PDA, is controlled by an arrangement comprising a handheld input unit (300), which records images and converts these to text strings comprising character sequences. The text strings recorded by the input unit (300) are used when controlling the electronic device (200). A signal-processing unit (210) receives the text strings, matches the format of a current text string to a format database comprising predetermined formats, each of which is associated with a command, and generates the command associated with the current text string, so as to control the electronic device (200). The signal-processing unit (210) can search for an address in the current text string. If an address is found, the signal-processing unit (210) causes the electronic device (200) to connect to the address. The input unit, which is capable of operating in different function modes, such as a mouse function mode and a text inputting mode, is arranged to automatically change between the different function modes on the basis of the contents of the recorded images, typically in identification of a predetermined pattern.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 3/033; G06K 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/042 (2006.01); G06F 3/03 (2006.01); G06F 3/0354 (2013.01); G06F 3/041 (2006.01); G09F 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/0317 (2013.01); G06F 3/0321 (2013.01); G06F 3/03545 (2013.01); G09F 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • US 5661506 A 19970826 - LAZZOUNI MOHAMED [US], et al
  • US 5852434 A 19981222 - SEKENDUR ORAL F [US]
  • DYMETMAN M; COPPERMAN M: "Intelligent paper", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, vol. 1375, March 1998 (1998-03-01), pages 392 - 406, XP002328425
  • See also references of WO 0161455A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0161454 A1 20010823; WO 0161454 A8 20020328; AU 3430801 A 20010827; AU 3430901 A 20010827; EP 1259874 A1 20021127; EP 1285329 A1 20030226; JP 2003523572 A 20030805; SE 0000939 D0 20000321; SE 0000939 L 20010819; WO 0161455 A1 20010823; WO 0161455 A8 20020328

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-10-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANOTO AB

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090319

2006-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANOTO AB

2005-08-03 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 LEAPFROG ENTERPRISES INC.

- Effective date: 20050530

2005-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANOTO IP LIC HB

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ERICSON, PETTER

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FAHRAEUS, CHRISTER

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020918;LT PAYMENT 20020918;LV PAYMENT 20020918;MK PAYMENT 20020918;RO PAYMENT 20020918;SI PAYMENT 20020918