Global Patent Index - EP 1259893 A2

EP 1259893 A2 2002-11-27 - IP LIBRARY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

Title (en)

IP LIBRARY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

Title (de)

IP-BIBLIOTHEKEN-VERWALTUNGSSYTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE GESTION DE BIBLIOTHEQUE PAR PROTOCOLE INTERNET

Publication

EP 1259893 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00992527 A

Priority

  • US 0042299 W
  • US 45602299 A
  • US 46756399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142969A2] An IP library management system includes IP data segregated into two separate databases: an IP database for storing virtual component data, and an IP catalog database for storing attributes pertaining to the stored virtual component data. The IP database and IP catalog database are connected over a local area network. An IP database file server acts as the intermediary between the IP database and the local area network, while one or more database servers act as the intermediary between the IP catalog database and the local area network. The local area network may be connected to a wide area network allowing remote access by a number of remote users. The IP library management system provides an IP authoring methodology and an IP integration methodology associated with the two databases. Users may access the IP library management system through a global computer network such as the Internet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06F 17/50 (2006.01); G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/10 (2013.01); G06F 17/30575 (2013.01); G06F 17/5045 (2013.01); G06F 2217/04 (2013.01); G06F 2217/66 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • BEHNAM B.: "Modelisation d'echange d'informations de composants electroniques virtuels", THESE - PHD SUMMARIZING THE WORK OF 3 YEARS, 13 November 1998 (1998-11-13), pages 40 - 170 + COVER AND INTRODUCTION, XP002997812
  • GHRAB M.A.: "Recherche dans des catalogues de composants electroniques virtuels", LABORATOIRE CSI-INPG - PHD, 25 September 2002 (2002-09-25)
  • GHANMI L.: "Echange des composants electroniques virtuels", LABORATOIRE CSI-INPG, 26 September 2002 (2002-09-26)
  • SKIBA K.: "Modelisation de systemes integres a base de composants electroniques virtuels", LABORATOIRE CSI-INPG - PHD, 26 September 2002 (2002-09-26)
  • MISSAOUI B.: "Gestion de droits d'acces sur composants electroniques virtuels", LABORATOIRE CSI-INPG, 26 September 2002 (2002-09-26)
  • BEHNAM B., SAUCIER G.: "An IP catalog, an important gateway into the world of IP business", 1ST EURIPIDES WS, September 1997 (1997-09-01), PARIS, FRANCE
  • BEHNAM, B. SAUCIER G.: "IP catalog, the catalyst of worldwise IP business", IWLAS '97, December 1997 (1997-12-01), GRENOBLE, FRANCE
  • BEHNAM B. ET AL.: "IP taxonomy, IP searching in catalog", DESIGN, AUTOMATION AND TEST IN EUROPE, February 1998 (1998-02-01), PARIS, FRANCE
  • RAFIDINITRIMO R. ET AL.: "An object-oriented IP managment system", IWLAS '98, December 1998 (1998-12-01), GRENOBLE, FRANCE
  • RAFIDINITRIMO R. ET AL.: "IP key features and an IP catalog management system", DESIGN, AUTOMATION AND TEST IN EUROPE, March 1999 (1999-03-01), MUNICH
  • RAFIDINITRIMO R. ET AL.: "Rights management for IP exchange", INT'L WS ON IP-BASED SYNTHESIS AND SYSTEM DESIGN, December 1999 (1999-12-01), GRENOBLE, FRANCE, pages 19 - 22, XP003000106
  • MAITRA A. ET AL.: "Management framework for IP e-commerce", DATE (DESIGN, AUTOMATION AND TEST IN EUROPE), 2000, MUNICH, GERMANY, pages 93 - 96, XP002997816
  • GHANMI L. ET AL.: "An efficient bridging solution between working space management system", INT'L WS ON IP-BASED SYNTHESIS AND SOC DESIGN, December 2000 (2000-12-01), GRENOBLE, pages 21 - 26, XP002999922
  • GHANMI L. ET AL.: "Intranet based IP supply chain for SoC project management", INT'L WS ON IP-BASED SOC DESIGN, December 2001 (2001-12-01), GRENOBLE, pages 4 PG-S, XP002997849
  • HAMDOUN M. ET AL.: "IP XML encapsulation portal", INT'L WS ON IP-BASED SYSTEM ON CHIP DESIGN, 2001, GRENOBLE, FRANCE, XP002997846
  • GHANMI L. ET AL.: "E-design based on the reuse paradigm", DESIGN AUTOMATION AND TEST IN EUROPE, March 2002 (2002-03-01), PARIS, FRANCE, XP002997814
  • GHANMI L. ET AL.: "IP exchange platform", MEDEA+ WS, 22 October 2002 (2002-10-22) - 23 October 2002 (2002-10-23), STRESA
  • SAUCIER G. ET AL.: "IP XML gateway", MEDEA WS, October 2002 (2002-10-01), AGRATE, pages 7 PG-S, XP002997819
  • SAUCIER G. ET AL.: "IP transfer: a mapping problem", INT'L WS ON IP BASED SOC DESIGN, 30 October 2002 (2002-10-30) - 31 October 2002 (2002-10-31), GRENOBLE, pages 14 PG-S, XP002997847
  • BLOUET P. ET AL.: "Exchange of hardware dependent software IPs", INT'L WS ON IP BASED SOC DESIGN, 30 October 2002 (2002-10-30) - 31 October 2002 (2002-10-31), GRENOBLE, pages 6 PG-S, XP002997850
  • SAUCIER G. ET AL.: "An ASIC platform design management portal", INT'L WS ON IP BASED SOC DESIGN, 13 November 2003 (2003-11-13) - 14 November 2003 (2003-11-14), GRENOBLE, pages 8 PG-S, XP002997851
  • GHANMI L. ET AL.: "Lessons learnt in IP reuse", INT'L WS ON IP BASED SOC DESIGN, 13 November 2003 (2003-11-13) - 14 November 2003 (2003-11-14), GRENOBLE, pages 1 - 6, XP002997845
  • SAUCIER G. ET AL.: "Ip packaging and delivery based on XML signatures: best practice to standard", INT'L WS ON IP BASED SOC DESIGN, 7 December 2005 (2005-12-07) - 8 December 2005 (2005-12-08), GRENOBLE, pages 1 - 7, XP002997848
  • COEURDEVEY P.: "base de donnees de composant virtuels", DEA DE MICRO-ELECTRONIQUE. LABORATOIRE SCI-INPG, June 1997 (1997-06-01)
  • GHANMI L.: "Modelisation et mecanisme d'echange de composants electronique virtuels", DEA DE RECHERCHE OPERATIONNELLE. LABORATOIRE SCI-INPG
  • NUSSAIZU B,: "gestion de droit d'acces", DEA DE RECHERCHE OPERATIONNELLE. LABORATOIRE SCI-INPG
  • See also references of WO 0142969A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142969 A2 20010614; WO 0142969 A3 20020912; AU 4507901 A 20010618; EP 1259893 A2 20021127; TW 469382 B 20011221

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060409

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040723

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 17/50 A

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI