Global Patent Index - EP 1259910 A2

EP 1259910 A2 2002-11-27 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MEASURING AND REPORTING USER REACTIONS TO PARTICULAR WEB PAGES OF A WEBSITE

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MEASURING AND REPORTING USER REACTIONS TO PARTICULAR WEB PAGES OF A WEBSITE

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN UND MELDEN DER REAKTIONEN EINES BENUTZERS AUF BESTIMMTE WEB-SEITEN EINER WEB-SEITENSAMMLUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'EVALUER ET DE RENDRE COMPTE DES REACTIONS D'UN UTILISATEUR FACE A DES PAGES PARTICULIERES D'UN SITE WEB

Publication

EP 1259910 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00959650 A

Priority

  • US 0023875 W
  • US 38525699 A
  • US 59514100 A
  • US 59505000 A
  • US 59533700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0116841A2] A system (10) for measuring a user reaction to a particular web page (28) of a website (26) includes a viewable icon (50) that solicits a subjective reaction to the particular page (28) from a user (16) that has accessed the particular page (28). The system (10) further includes software associated with the icon (50) that receives the subjective user reaction for reporting to a website owner (12). Software associated with the icon (50) may be incorporated into software of the particular page (28). Software associated with the icon (50) may include a call to a directory containing a script that receives the user reaction. A reporting module (46) coupled to a database (36) containing user reaction information for each page (28) may generate reports (100) for communication to the website owner (12), each report (100) reflecting the subjective user reactions to one or more particular pages (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/0484 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/04847 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • SCOTT E. SAMPSON: "GATHERING CUSTOMER FEEDBACK VIA THE INTERNET: INSTRUMENTS AND PROSPECTS", INDUSTRIAL MANAGEMENT & DATA SYSTEMS, vol. 98, no. 2, February 1998 (1998-02-01), pages 71 - 82, XP003035562
  • MCDONALD M.J. ET L: "MULTIMEDIA FEEDBACK SYSTEMS FOR ENGINEERING", ANS ROBOTICS AND REMOTE SYSTEMS 8TH INTERNATIONAL TOPICAL MEETING, 25 April 1999 (1999-04-25) - 29 April 1999 (1999-04-29), PITTSBURGH, PENNSYLVANIOA, USA, pages 1 - 7, XP003035563, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:HTTP://WWW.OSTI.GOV/SCITECH/BIBLIO/2828>

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0116841 A2 20010308; WO 0116841 A8 20020919; AU 7093400 A 20010326; EP 1259910 A2 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150312

2015-03-12 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100217

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI