Global Patent Index - EP 1259953 A2

EP 1259953 A2 2002-11-27 - DELABELLING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (en)

DELABELLING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (de)

ENTETIKETTIERVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DURCHFÜHREN DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DESETIQUETAGE

Publication

EP 1259953 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01971979 A

Priority

  • DE 10051631 A
  • DE 10061245 A
  • EP 0109955 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0233684A2] The invention relates to a method for detaching or removing adhesive labels from a label support, said labels adhering thereto with a certain adhesive force, in or on said label support, especially in or on a case of bottles, particularly in or on the side panels thereof. According to the invention, a band which is tear-resistant, seal-proof, preferably a little narrower than the label is placed with the front surface thereof on the free visible face of the label on the opposite side of the label support; the band is connected to the label with a detaching force working between the label and the band in a material fit; said detaching force is greater than the adhesive force of the label on the label support; and the band with the label support joined thereto in a material fit is removed. The invention also relates to a device whiche nables said method to be carried out.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 69/00 (2006.01); B08B 7/00 (2006.01); B08B 9/08 (2006.01); B29C 63/00 (2006.01); G09F 3/00 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 63/0013 (2013.01); B08B 7/0028 (2013.01); B08B 9/083 (2013.01); G09F 3/00 (2013.01); G09F 3/10 (2013.01); B29L 2031/7158 (2013.01); B29L 2031/744 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0233684A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0233684 A2 20020425; WO 0233684 A3 20020912; AU 9181001 A 20020429; EP 1259953 A2 20021127; JP 2004512557 A 20040422

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050315

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040902

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORDENIA DEUTSCHLAND PACIMEX GMBH

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09F 3/10 A

2003-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 08B 9/08 B

2003-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 08B 7/00 B

2003-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09F 3/00 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI