Global Patent Index - EP 1259957 A1

EP 1259957 A1 2002-11-27 - CLOSED-LOOP MULTIMODE MIXED-DOMAIN SPEECH CODER

Title (en)

CLOSED-LOOP MULTIMODE MIXED-DOMAIN SPEECH CODER

Title (de)

MULTIMODALER MISCHBEREICH-SPRACHKODIERER MIT GESCHLOSSENER REGELSCHLEIFE

Title (fr)

CODEUR VOCAL MULTIMODE A DOMAINE MIXTE ET EN BOUCLE FERMEE

Publication

EP 1259957 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00912053 A

Priority

US 0005140 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0165544A1] A closed-loop, multimode, mixed-domain linear prediction (MDLP) speech coder includes a high-rate, time-domain coding mode, a low-rate, frequency-domain coding mode, and a closed-loop mode-selection mechanism for selecting a coding mode for the coder based upon the speech content of frames input to the coder. Transition speech (i.e., from unvoiced speech to voiced speech, or vice versa) frames are encoded with the high-rate, time-domain coding mode, which may be a CELP coding mode. Voiced speech frames are encoded with the low-rate, frequency-domain coding mode, which may be a harmonic coding mode. Phase parameters are not encoded by the frequency-domain coding mode, and are instead modeled in accordance with, e.g., a quadratic phase model. For each speech frame encoded with the frequency-domain coding mode, the initial phase value is taken to be the initial phase value of the immediately preceding speech frame encoded with the frequency-domain coding mode. If the immediately preceding speech frame was encoded with the time-domain coding mode, the initial phase value of the current speech frame is computed from the decoded speech frame information of the immediately preceding, time-domain-encoded speech frame. Each speech frame encoded with the frequency-domain coding mode may be compared with the corresponding input speech frame to obtain a performance measure. If the performance measure falls below a predefined threshold value, the input speech frame is encoded with the time-domain coding mode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/18 (2013.01); H03M 7/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165544A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0165544 A1 20010907; AT 341074 T 20061015; AU 3385100 A 20010912; CN 1266674 C 20060726; CN 1437747 A 20030820; DE 60031002 D1 20061109; DE 60031002 T2 20070510; EP 1259957 A1 20021127; EP 1259957 B1 20060927; ES 2269112 T3 20070401; HK 1055833 A1 20070112; JP 2003525473 A 20030826; JP 4907826 B2 20120404

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060927

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061228

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070628

2007-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269112 T3

2007-03-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070313

2007-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-12-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-11-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031002 P 20061109

2006-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-09-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-09-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-09-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-09-27 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-09-27 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-09-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-01-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CLOSED-LOOP MULTIMODE MIXED-DOMAIN SPEECH CODER

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050506

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: QUALCOMM INCORPORATED

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI