Global Patent Index - EP 1259970 A1

EP 1259970 A1 2002-11-27 - SECURE CIRCUIT SUBASSEMBLY, SECURE CONTROL SUBASSEMBLY AND A SUBASSEMBLY SYSTEM

Title (en)

SECURE CIRCUIT SUBASSEMBLY, SECURE CONTROL SUBASSEMBLY AND A SUBASSEMBLY SYSTEM

Title (de)

SICHERE SCHALTBAUGRUPPE, SICHERE ANSTEUERBAUGRUPPE UND BAUGRUPPENSYSTEM

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE COMMUTATION SUR, ENSEMBLE DE COMMANDE SUR ET SYSTEME D'ENSEMBLES

Publication

EP 1259970 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01913648 A

Priority

  • DE 0100572 W
  • DE 10009498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10009498A1] A safe switching module has a basic actuator (2), an additional actuator (3) and a safe drive/control unit (4), in which at least one input terminal (8) is electrically connectable by means of the actuators (2,3) to at least one output terminal (7), and the input terminal (8) is electrically isolated from the output terminal (7) as soon as at least one of the actuators (2,3) is deactivated. The basic actuator (2) is activated during normal functioning by supply of electrical energy and with the absence of an electrical energy supply, the basic actuator is deactivated. The control unit (4) is supplied with the actual- and the desired-activation state of the basic actuator (2). The switching module has at least two supply terminals (11) and at least one return line terminal (12) for supply of electrical energy to the switching module, the latter having a connection element (15) for precisely electrically connecting one of the supply terminals (11) to the supply line (14). The drive/control unit (4) then deactivates the additional actuator (3) at least, when the basic actuator (2) remains active despite an interrupted power supply to the basic actuator (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165578A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10009498 A1 20010920; EP 1259970 A1 20021127; EP 1259970 B1 20040922; WO 0165578 A1 20010907

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103751 P 20041028

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030808

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR