Global Patent Index - EP 1259971 A1

EP 1259971 A1 2002-11-27 - ELECTROMAGNETIC SWITCHING DEVICE, FOR EXAMPLE, CONTACTOR

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC SWITCHING DEVICE, FOR EXAMPLE, CONTACTOR

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES SCHALTGERÄT, Z.B. SCHÜTZ

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE, PAR EX. CONTACTEUR

Publication

EP 1259971 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01913684 A

Priority

  • DE 0100634 W
  • DE 10009496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10009496A1] An electromechanical switching device has a housing (1) and a withdrawable unit (3) for inserting into the housing (1) in an insertion direction (x). A magnetic yoke (4) is held by the withdrawable unit (3) by means of which an attraction force can be exerted on an armature (6). Two fixture tabs (7) are moulded on the magnetic yoke (4) and extend outwards, as viewed in the direction of insertion (x), and a retaining stirrup extending transversely to the insertion direction (x) grips over one of tabs (7) and under two retaining tongues integrally formed on the withdrawable unit (3).

[origin: DE10009496A1] An electromechanical switching device has a housing (1) and a withdrawable unit (3) for inserting into the housing (1) in an insertion direction (x). A magnetic yoke (4) is held by the withdrawable unit (3) by means of which an attraction force can be exerted on an armature (6). Two fixture tabs (7) are moulded on the magnetic yoke (4) and extend outwards, as viewed in the direction of insertion (x), and a retaining stirrup extending transversely to the insertion direction (x) grips over one of tabs (7) and under two retaining tongues integrally formed on the withdrawable unit (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/045 (2013.01); H01H 50/541 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165579A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10009496 A1 20010906; DE 10009496 C2 20011213; CN 1286133 C 20061122; CN 1397080 A 20030212; DE 50111276 D1 20061130; EP 1259971 A1 20021127; EP 1259971 B1 20061018; US 2003020575 A1 20030130; US 6597267 B2 20030722; WO 0165579 A1 20010907

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100220

2007-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111276 P 20061130

2006-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR