Global Patent Index - EP 1259978 A2

EP 1259978 A2 2002-11-27 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING GROUP III-N, GROUP III-V-N AND METAL-NITROGEN COMPONENT STRUCTURES ON SI SUBSTRATES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING GROUP III-N, GROUP III-V-N AND METAL-NITROGEN COMPONENT STRUCTURES ON SI SUBSTRATES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GRUPPE-III-N, GRUP PE-III-V-N UND METALL-STICKSTOFF-BAUELEMENTSTRUKTUREN AUF Si-SUBSTRATEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES STRUCTURES DE COMPOSANTS GROUPE-III-N, GROUPE-III-V-N ET METAL-AZOTE SUR DES SUBSTRATS SI

Publication

EP 1259978 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01921151 A

Priority

  • DE 0100777 W
  • DE 10009945 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0165592A2] The invention relates to a method and a device for producing Group-III-N, Group-III-V-N and metal-nitrogen component structures on Si substrates by means of organometallic gas phase epitaxy. The inventive method and the corresponding device are characterised in that a low-temperature germination layer and/or a low-temperature buffer layer is/are produced from a Group III-V semiconductor and/or a metal-Group V connecting semiconductor and a component layer or sequence of layers is produced from Group-III-N, Group-III-V-N or metal-Group-V semiconductors in a horizontal growth chamber, in that a minimal lateral temperature difference of less than 5 K, preferably less than 1K, an adjustable roof temperature and/or wall temperature and a temperature on a substrate holder that is caused to rotate by a gas cushion are maintained, the reaction gases being introduced in such a way as to prevent any unwanted interaction between the starting gases and in such a way that the procedure can be observed without disturbing the growth process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/205

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 33/00 (2006.01); C30B 25/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/205 (2006.01); H01S 5/323 (2006.01); H01L 21/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C30B 25/02 (2013.01); C30B 29/403 (2013.01); C30B 29/406 (2013.01); H01L 21/02381 (2013.01); H01L 21/0254 (2013.01); H01L 21/0262 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165592A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0165592 A2 20010907; WO 0165592 A3 20011206; EP 1259978 A2 20021127; JP 2003526203 A 20030902; KR 20020086595 A 20021118; US 2003070610 A1 20030417

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151001

2014-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIXTRON SE

2011-03-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIXTRON SE

2009-08-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIXTRON AG

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061006

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020727

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR