Global Patent Index - EP 1259983 A1

EP 1259983 A1 2002-11-27 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTION BETWEEN TWO SURFACES OF A SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CONNECTION BETWEEN TWO SURFACES OF A SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN ZWEI SUBSTRATOBERFLÄCHEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN REALISIERUNG

Title (fr)

CONNEXION ELECTRIQUE ENTRE DEUX FACES D'UN SUBSTRAT ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION

Publication

EP 1259983 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01909909 A

Priority

  • FR 0100565 W
  • FR 0002446 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2805709A1] The electrical connection between two sides of a conductor or semiconductor substrate (20) comprises at least one electrically insulating trench (36,44) extending in full thickness of substrate, filled to at least part of its height, and completely surrounding a part (46) of substrate, and two conductors, one in the form of a contact pad (42) on lower side of substrate in part (46). The electrical connection is established by the part (46) of substrate and the two conductors (38,42). The first trench is etched in the substrate starting on upper side and is filled with an electrically insulating material. The filled part of trench is the first trench whose walls are covered with an insulating layer, and the trench is filled with another material (36) whose coefficient of thermal expansion is close to that of the substrate. The trench comprises a non-filled part formed by the second trench (44) etched in the substrate starting on lower side (40). The second trench is also filled. The method for producing the electrical connection comprises operations which include the making and filling of trench, the deposition of first conductor, and the formation of second conductor. The substrate is thinned to a desired thickness before the formation of second trench, and the second conductor is formed on the thinned side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/768; H01L 23/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/52 (2006.01); H01L 21/3205 (2006.01); H01L 21/768 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/76898 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2805709 A1 20010831; FR 2805709 B1 20020517; EP 1259983 A1 20021127; JP 2003526207 A 20030902; JP 2012231173 A 20121122; JP 5329733 B2 20131030; US 2003022475 A1 20030130; US 6815827 B2 20041109; WO 0165598 A1 20010907

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES

2009-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090512

2006-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE

2005-10-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VIEUX-ROCHAZ, LINE

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CUCHET, ROBERT

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GIRARD, OLIVIER

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR