Global Patent Index - EP 1259996 A2

EP 1259996 A2 2002-11-27 - FUEL CELL INSTALLATION

Title (en)

FUEL CELL INSTALLATION

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFZELLENANLAGE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE CELLULES ELECTROCHIMIQUES

Publication

EP 1259996 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00987024 A

Priority

  • DE 0003767 W
  • DE 19953614 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19953614A1] When a fuel cell installation (41) is switched off, there is danger that residual oxygen remains in the fuel cells of the fuel cell installation (41). Said residual oxygen results in undesired oxidations that considerably limit the output and life-time of the fuel cell installation (41). The aim of the invention is therefore to make sure that enough hydrogen remains in the fuel cells to bring the entire oxygen within the fuel cells to an electrochemical reaction when the fuel cell installation is switched off. To this end, the invention provides a fuel cell installation (41) in which the anode gas chamber (7b, 51) adjoining the anodes (3a, 23a, 44a) of the fuel cells is at least twice as big as the cathode gas chamber (7b, 51b) adjoining the cathodes (3b, 23b, 44b) of the fuel cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 8/24; H01M 8/10; H01M 8/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/02 (2016.01); H01M 8/04223 (2016.01); H01M 8/1007 (2016.01); H01M 8/241 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/04228 (2016.02); H01M 8/02 (2013.01); H01M 8/04223 (2013.01); H01M 8/1007 (2013.01); H01M 8/241 (2013.01); H01M 2300/0082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19953614 A1 20010517; CA 2390027 A1 20010517; EP 1259996 A2 20021127; JP 2003515873 A 20030507; US 2002150809 A1 20021017; WO 0135480 A2 20010517; WO 0135480 A3 20020919

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070224

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030801

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020416

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE