Global Patent Index - EP 1260063 A2

EP 1260063 A2 2002-11-27 - AUTOMATED ROUTER PORT EXTENSION

Title (en)

AUTOMATED ROUTER PORT EXTENSION

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHE ERWEITERUNG EINES ROUTERPORTS

Title (fr)

EXTENSION DE PORT DE ROUTEUR AUTOMATISE

Publication

EP 1260063 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00992503 A

Priority

  • US 0042094 W
  • US 51403200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0163847A2] A communication system is provided that provides user equipment with a high speed link to a wide area network. The system includes a ring network that has a plurality of network nodes coupled together by one or more data communication paths. The system also includes an access device that is coupled to one of the network nodes and coupled to the user equipment of at least one user. The access device is operable to receive an upstream data packet from the user equipment, operable to convert the received upstream data packet to a format compatible for transmission on the ring network, and operable to forward the converted upstream data packet onto at least one data communication path on the ring network. The access device is also operable to receive a downstream data packet from at least one data communication path on the ring network, operable to convert the received downstream data packet to a format compatible for receipt by the user equipment, and operable to forward the converted downstream data packet to the user.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/28; H04J 3/08; H04J 3/16; H04L 12/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04J 3/16 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 12/42 (2006.01); H04L 12/46 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/2898 (2013.01); H04J 3/1694 (2013.01); H04L 12/2865 (2013.01); H04L 12/2879 (2013.01); H04L 12/2896 (2013.01); H04L 12/42 (2013.01); H04L 12/4616 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 69/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163847A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0163847 A2 20010830; WO 0163847 A3 20020613; AU 4506001 A 20010903; CA 2401051 A1 20010830; EP 1260063 A2 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031231

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARCONI INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY (RINGFENCE) INC.

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUPONT, JEAN-LOU

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI