Global Patent Index - EP 1260064 A2

EP 1260064 A2 2002-11-27 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR PROVIDING A BACK-UP CIRCUIT FOR TRANSMISSION DEVICES IN RING ARCHITECTURES THAT ROUTE MPLS PACKETS

Title (en)

CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR PROVIDING A BACK-UP CIRCUIT FOR TRANSMISSION DEVICES IN RING ARCHITECTURES THAT ROUTE MPLS PACKETS

Title (de)

SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM ERSATZSCHALTEN VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSEINRICHTUNGEN IN MPLS-PAKETE FÜHRENDE RINGARCHITEKTUREN

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT POUR COMMUTATION DE REMPLACEMENT DE DISPOSITIFS DE TRANSMISSION DANS DES ARCHITECTURES EN BOUCLE UTILISANT LES PAQUETS A COMMUTATION PAR ETIQUETTE MULTIPROTOCOLE (MPLS)

Publication

EP 1260064 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01923544 A

Priority

  • EP 01923544 A
  • EP 0100434 W
  • EP 00104147 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1130853A1] The reconfiguration circuit allows the asynchronous transfer mode information cells to be switched to a replacement path for a faulty section of the transmission path in a transmission ring with 2 opposing unidirectional transmission paths for multiprotocol label switched packets, provided by linear transmission sections between spaced ring nodes (NA-ND). The operating path and the replacement path have respective priorities, with the priorities listed in local and global priority tables, with a reconfiguration protocol initiated in response to a reconfiguration request upon detection of operating path failure by a monitoring device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/437

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/437 (2006.01); H04L 12/70 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/437 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5665 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0165776A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1130853 A1 20010905; AU 2001250297 B2 20040429; AU 5029701 A 20010912; CA 2401433 A1 20010907; CN 1331334 C 20070808; CN 1618211 A 20050518; EP 1260064 A2 20021127; US 2004013085 A1 20040122; US 6704279 B2 20040309; WO 0165776 A2 20010907; WO 0165776 A3 20020131

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070619

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061206

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR