Global Patent Index - EP 1260069 A2

EP 1260069 A2 2002-11-27 - PRESENCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM USING CONTEXT INFORMATION

Title (en)

PRESENCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM USING CONTEXT INFORMATION

Title (de)

PRÄSENZVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM MIT KONTEXTINFORMATIONEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE GESTION DE PRESENCE FAISANT APPEL A UNE INFORMATION DE CONTEXTE

Publication

EP 1260069 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00985444 A

Priority

  • GB 0004500 W
  • US 46067799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145322A2] A presence management system is described whereby connections between watching parties and watched parties in a multiple access communications network are managed. When the presence management system receives a contact request from a watching party it determines whether the required watched party is available for contact. The system then provides information about this to the watching party who made the request. The presence management system chooses the best mode of communication (e.g. email or fax) taking into account the watched parties preferences and details about the facilities available to the watching party. If, the presence management system informs the watching party that the watched party is unavailable, the watching party is able to set up a monitor. In determining whether the required watched party is available for contact, the presence management system uses stored information about the watched party, information about the required connection (e.g. size and type) and also rules. In addition, information about events from the multiple access network are used e.g. geographical location of watched party mobile phones. Advantageously, information from third party applications is made available to the presence management system. For example, information about credit card transactions and calling card use. This high level information provides details about a watched party's location and activities that is accurate and up-to-date. By using this information the performance and ability of the presence management system is improved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/58; H04L 12/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/42 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); H04L 12/26 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 43/00 (2013.01); H04L 67/24 (2013.01); H04L 67/26 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145322A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145322 A2 20010621; WO 0145322 A3 20020926; AU 2186301 A 20010625; CA 2394317 A1 20010621; CA 2394317 C 20131001; EP 1260069 A2 20021127; JP 2003517771 A 20030527; JP 2014147128 A 20140814

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-31 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080822

2007-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI