Global Patent Index - EP 1260145 A1

EP 1260145 A1 2002-11-27 - Microencapsulated and/or microgranulated product for animal feeding with a base of powdered milk, its derivatives and vegetable fats and intended use of this product

Title (en)

Microencapsulated and/or microgranulated product for animal feeding with a base of powdered milk, its derivatives and vegetable fats and intended use of this product

Title (de)

Mikroverkapselte und/oder mikrogranulierte Produkte auf Basis von Milchpulver, dessen Derivate und pflanzliche Fette in der Tierernährung, und deren Verwendung

Title (fr)

Produits microencapsulés et/ou microgranulés à base de lait en poudre, ses dérivés et graisses végétales pour l'alimentation animale, et leur utilisation

Publication

EP 1260145 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02010693 A

Priority

IT PD20010116 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a new product, a new production system for milk replacers, and a new method of use of milk replacers. The product is obtained by means of a spray-cooling system which consists of propagating the milk replacers with sugars and other proteins, even of vegetable origin, in a system of vegetable fats: spray-cooling (initial liquid phase and solid phase in fast cooling chambers, where it takes on the form of microcapsules and microgranules). With this new technique it is possible to completely eliminate the reconstitution of powdered milk and the animals are fed with a microencapsulated-microgranulated product which guarantees the same performance as other milk replacers, but has the great advantage of being used just as it is, with no need to be reconstituted. The product is administered just as it is in the feeding trough or through self-feeders, unifeed mixers for dry feed already in use in cattle and/or pig and poultry farms, in the desired quantities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23K 1/00; A23K 1/08; A23K 1/16; A23K 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23K 1/00 (2006.01); A23K 1/08 (2006.01); A23K 1/16 (2006.01); A23K 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23K 50/60 (2016.05); A23K 10/28 (2016.05); A23K 20/158 (2016.05); A23K 40/30 (2016.05); Y02P 60/875 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] GB 1604381 A 19811209 - UNILEVER LTD
  • [Y] GB 2153647 A 19850829 - MERRICK FOODS INC
  • [Y] US 4542031 A 19850917 - NAKAJIMA TAIJI [JP], et al
  • [A] GB 1289433 A 19720920
  • [A] G. COZZI ET AL.: "Somministrazione di un mangime solido a vitelli a carne bianca stabulati in gabbia individuale o in box di gruppo. 1. Prestazioni produttive e qualita della carne", ZOOTECNICA E NUTRIZIONE ANIMALE, vol. 26, no. 6, 2000, IT, pages 233 - 242, XP001100079
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 09 31 July 1998 (1998-07-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260145 A1 20021127; IT PD20010116 A1 20021125

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060801

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030523

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI